Siqueiros v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael L Brown |
Referred: | Linda T Walker |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01700 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 12:40 AM EDT |
Defendant
Ally Financial Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
|
|
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Pedro Vega Siqueiros
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 05/01 3:59 PM
ORDER granting6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant shall have up to and including June 17, 2024, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on this 1st day of May, 2024. (pdt) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/30 12:53 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Ally Financial Inc.. |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Return of Service Executed
Mon 04/29 3:14 PM
Return of Service Executed by Pedro Vega Siqueiros. Ally Financial Inc. served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024. (Gomez, Octavio) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 04/24 10:03 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pedro Vega Siqueiros. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/23/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Gomez, Octavio) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/23 12:23 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pedro Vega Siqueiros. (Gomez, Octavio) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Mon 04/22 1:49 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Ally Financial Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (bmr) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/22 1:48 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Pedro Vega Siqueiros. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13377730)(bmr) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |