Birnbrey v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Steven D Grimberg |
Referred: | J Elizabeth Mcbath |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01703 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/24 9:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Joan Warren, GOV on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security Administration (Warren, Susan) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/23 2:42 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Dorothy Birnbrey.(tas) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/23 2:28 PM
ORDER GRANTING1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transmit a Notice of Service of Social Security Complaint to the Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's office in lieu of Plaintiff serving a summons and complaint, as provided in Fed. R. Civ. P. Supp. Soc. Sec. Rule 3. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 4/23/2024. (tas) |
|
notice
Notice of Service of Social Security Complaint
Tue 04/23 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Service of Social Security Complaint. Pursuant to Supplemental Rule 3 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing notifying the USA and the Regional SSA Office of General Counsel of the3 Complaint,. No summons shall issue. Commissioner, Social Security Administration served on 4/23/2024, answer due 8/1/2024. Counsel for USA must enter a notice of appearance prior to viewing documents in this civil action. (tas) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/22 2:52 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dorothy Birnbrey.(bmr) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Motion to file IFP, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/22 2:54 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (bmr) |