Johnson v. First Advantage Background Services, Corp
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Eleanor L Ross |
Referred: | Christopher C Bly |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01710 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 12:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
First Advantage Background Services, Corp
|
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Jerriod Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 04/26 12:59 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brandon Jerriod Johnson. First Advantage Background Services, Corp waiver mailed on 4/22/2024, answer due 6/21/2024. (Fok, Devin) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
misc
Approval of Application for Admission PHV
Thu 04/25 10:32 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:4 APPLICATION for Admission of Devin Fok Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13385764). Attorney Devin Heng Fok added appearing on behalf of Brandon Jerriod Johnson. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (esr) |
||
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/25 10:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Devin Fok. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 4/25/24. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/24 8:55 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Devin Fok Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13385764). with Brief In Support by Brandon Jerriod Johnson.(Bertschi, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/22 3:54 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Brandon Jerriod Johnson. (Bertschi, Craig) |
|
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Mon 04/22 3:26 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to First Advantage Background Services, Corp. (bmr) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/22 3:24 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Brandon Jerriod Johnson. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13378988)(bmr) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP
Mon 04/22 4:51 PM
Clerk's Notation re3 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brandon Jerriod Johnson. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) |