Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Barry W Ashe
Referred: Eva J Dossier
Case #: 2:24-cv-01016
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 19, 2024 6:41 AM CDT
Defendant
Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund
Represented By
Rosalie Margaret Haug
Chaffe Mccall Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Julie Durel Livaudais
Chaffe Mccall Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Amy L. McIntire
Chaffe Mccall Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Plaintiff
Gerald Young
Represented By
Kevin S. Vogeltanz
The Law Office Of Kevin S. Vogeltanz, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 04/22 10:02 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Continue Pretrial Deadlines, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 4/21/2025. (meb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
13 13 motion Continue Thu 04/17 4:29 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Continue Pre-Trial Deadlines by Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund.(McIntire, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
12 12 order Set Hearings Order Wed 10/16 11:43 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: IT IS ORDERED that a settlement conference is scheduled for Friday, July 18, 2025, at 9:30 a.m., before the undersigned magistrate judge. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties comply with the attached Settlement Conference Guidelines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier on 10/16/2024. (rkr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Settlement Conference Guidelines
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/15 10:42 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2025 09:30 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. Jury Trial set for 8/25/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. All discovery must be completed by 7/25/2025. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 10/15/2024.(clc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 09/10 10:32 AM
NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference reset for 10/2/2024 01:30 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (clc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order Vacating Case Referral to Magistrate Judge Wed 08/28 11:03 AM
Order Vacating Case Referral to Magistrate Judge. FURTHER ORDERED that a telephone scheduling conference will be held on Wednesday, September 11, 2024, at 1:30 p.m. for the purpose of scheduling a pre-trial conference and trial on the merits and for a discussion of the status and discovery cut-off dates. The Court will be represented at the conference by its case manager. All parties are to call into the conference call at (877) 873-8018, Access Code: 2994682. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 8/28/2024.(clc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order Tue 08/27 2:25 PM
NOTICE OF 636(c) NON CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The undersigned Magistrate Judge has been notified that all parties have not consented to proceed to trial before a Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier on 8/27/2024. (rkr) (NEF Section M)
Related: [-]
7 7 minutes Status Conference Tue 08/27 1:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier: Status Conference held on 8/27/2024. The Court was advised that not all parties consent to proceed to trial before a Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). A Notice of Non Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge will follow. (rkr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 08/01 4:14 PM
AMENDED ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE: IT IS ORDERED that a preliminary conference is scheduled for Tuesday, August 27, 2024, at 9:30 a.m., before the undersigned magistrate judge. Counsel are to participate in the conference by dialing (888) 398-2342 and entering access code 3035301. If all parties consent, the attached form is to be circulated, with each party signing the same form. Once signed by all parties and/or counsel, the completed form should be sent to the undersigned at efile- dossier@laed.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier on 8/1/2024. (rkr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent to Proceed Form
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order Set Hearings Wed 07/31 3:37 PM
ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE: IT IS ORDERED that a preliminary conference is scheduled for Tuesday, September 24, 2024, at 9:30 a.m., before the undersigned magistrate judge. Counsel are to participate in the conference by dialing (888) 398-2342 and entering access code 3035301. If all parties consent, the attached form is to be circulated, with each party signing the same form. Once signed by all parties and/or counsel, the completed form should be sent to the undersigned at efile- dossier@laed.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier on 7/31/2024. (rkr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent to Proceed Form
Monday, July 29, 2024
4 4 21 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/29 2:54 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund.Attorney Julie Durel Livaudais added to party Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund(pty:dft).(Livaudais, Julie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 04/23 11:25 AM
Summons Issued as to Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund. (gla)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Tue 04/23 8:19 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier. (cc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/22 11:32 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against The Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10497190) filed by Gerald Young.Attorney Kevin S. Vogeltanz added to party Gerald Young(pty:pla).(Vogeltanz, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons