Kelly v. Cardoso et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Michael E Hegarty |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01096 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 2:04 AM MDT |
Defendant
Jayma Cardoso
|
|
Defendant
Chef's Club Aspen, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Stephane De Baets
|
|
Defendant
Elevated Returns, LLC
|
|
Defendant
JC Hospitality Aspen LLC d/b/a The Snow Lodge
|
|
Defendant
JCLP Hospitality LLC d/b/a The Snow Lodge
|
|
Plaintiff
Tony Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Summons Issued
Mon 04/29 10:20 AM
SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (dgumb, ) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons | ||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Summons Request
Fri 04/26 10:47 AM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to JCLP Hospitality LLC re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Tony Kelly. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Summons Request
Fri 04/26 10:46 AM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to JC Hospitality Aspen LLC re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Tony Kelly. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Summons Request
Fri 04/26 10:45 AM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Elevated Returns, LLC re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Tony Kelly. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Summons Request
Fri 04/26 10:45 AM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Stephane De Baets re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Tony Kelly. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Summons Request
Fri 04/26 10:44 AM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Chef's Club Aspen, Inc. re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Tony Kelly. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Summons Request
Fri 04/26 10:43 AM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jayma Cardoso re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Tony Kelly. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Advisory Document Noncompliance
Fri 04/26 8:53 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re:7 Summons Request,8 Summons Request,9 Summons Request,10 Summons Request,11 Summons Request,12 Summons Request filed by attorney Lincoln Dee Bandlow. The summons will not be issued due to an incomplete case caption. The summons must list all defendants; "et al." cannot substitute the listing of all parties named in the case. per Fed Civ. Rule 4 (Text Only Entry) (dgumb, ) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Summons Request
Thu 04/25 11:12 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to JCLP Hospitality LLC d/b/a The Snow Lodge re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Tony Kelly. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Summons Request
Thu 04/25 11:11 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to JC Hospitality Aspen LLC d/b/a The Snow Lodge re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Tony Kelly. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Summons Request
Thu 04/25 11:10 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Elevated Returns, LLC re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Tony Kelly. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Summons Request
Thu 04/25 11:09 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Stephane De Baets re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Tony Kelly. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Summons Request
Thu 04/25 11:08 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Chef's Club Aspen, Inc. re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Tony Kelly. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Summons Request
Thu 04/25 11:07 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jayma Cardoso re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Tony Kelly. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Minute Order
Tue 04/23 12:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Magistrate Consent Form due 6/25/2024 . Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/25/2024 . Scheduling Conference set for 7/2/2024 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/23/2024. (dgumb, ) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Tue 04/23 10:11 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued: Summonses submitted have an incomplete caption and have not been issued. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (blaws) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Tue 04/23 10:09 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (blaws) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Report re: Copyright
Tue 04/23 10:04 AM
Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (blaws) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Supplement/Amendment
Mon 04/22 10:52 PM
SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, AO121 form and Summons by Plaintiff Tony Kelly.(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons | ||
1 | 1
10
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/22 10:28 PM
COMPLAINT - Action for Damages for Property Rights Infringement against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9649985)Attorney Lincoln Dee Bandlow added to party Tony Kelly(pty:pla), filed by Tony Kelly.(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 |