Kevin Brooks v. Josh Richardson, et al
Original Case: 1:22-cv-06738
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01651 |
Type | civil / us |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 4:24 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
JOSH RICHARDSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BRYANT MCGEE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
LESLEE D. BROOKS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
E. HARBISON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MELISSA SCHREIBER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
KEVIN BROOKS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 3:51 AM CDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 U.S. civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 05/06/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/03/2024 for Kevin Brooks [1] [7377833] 24-1651 (AP) [Entered: 04/22/2024 03:11 PM] | |
Att: 1 24 pgs Civil Case | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court |