Walter Allen v. Municipal Credit Union
Original Case: 1:23-cv-03928
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cvpri-07054 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 4:52 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Municipal Credit Union, M.C.U.
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Walter L. Allen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 4:52 AM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. 24-7054 | ||
CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [2050628] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7021 0350 0001 9947 4570 ] of order [2050623-5], [2050624-5]. Certified Mail Receipt due 05/22/2024 from Walter L. Allen. 24-7054 | ||
5 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2050616] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:23-cv-03928-UNA filed by Walter L. Allen. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 24-7054 24-7054 | ||
1 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2050623] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 05/22/2024. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. 24-7054 | ||
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2050624] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 06/11/2024. APPENDIX due 06/11/2024. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. 24-7054 |