GP Chaps, LLC et al v. Truist Bank
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Donald M Middlebrooks |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-80501 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 15th Judicial Circuit Court in and for Palm Beach, 2024-CA-001001 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 11:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Truist Bank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GP Chaps, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Porcha 001, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Wed 05/01 3:21 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant, Truist Bank, seeks a fourteen-day extension of time, from April 30, 2024, to May 14, 2024, to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant provides no facts from which I can discern whether good cause exists to grant the Motion. I will grant a short extension because the request is unopposed. The new deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is May 8, 2024. However, counsel for Defendant is cautioned that future motions lacking factual support will be summarily denied. Additionally, motions for extensions of time must be filed in advance of the deadline sought to be extended. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/1/2024. (kid) |
|
utility
~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline
Wed 05/01 3:54 PM
Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Truist Bank response/answer due 5/8/2024. (per order de#6) (drz) |
||
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Tue 04/30 5:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Truist Bank. (Agnello, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Tue 04/23 11:21 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Documents Improperly Arranged. The Filer did not properly attach the Civil Cover Sheet . Future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Civil Case Opening Guide. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pc) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/23 11:11 AM
Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Truist Bank identifying Corporate Parent BB&T Corporation, Corporate Parent Branch Banking and Trust Company, Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent SunTrust Bank, Corporate Parent SunTrust Banks, Inc. for Truist Bank (Agnello, Nicholas) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 04/23 10:54 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint)
Tue 04/23 10:24 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17469642, filed by Truist Bank.(Agnello, Nicholas) (Complaint see pg.5 of Exh.1, no Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed) Modified text on 4/23/2024 (pc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Docket Sheet |