De La Torre Pardo v. HIALEAH SQUARE GP et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Roy K Altman |
Referred: | Eduardo I Sanchez |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21534 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 12:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
ATLANTIC COAST ENTERPRISES, LLC
|
|
Defendant
HIALEAH SQUARE GP
|
|
Plaintiff
Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Certificate of Counsel
Tue 04/30 1:57 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re4 Order, by Ramon Julio Diego on behalf of Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo (Diego, Ramon) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo | ||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Thu 04/25 12:26 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo. ATLANTIC COAST ENTERPRISES, LLC served on 4/24/2024, response/answer due 5/15/2024. (Virues, Beverly) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Wed 04/24 11:34 AM
ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/23/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw) |
|
4 | 4
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Wed 04/24 11:32 AM
ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT AND VERIFIED AFFIDAVIT REGARDING VISITS TO PROPERTY. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/23/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/23 3:21 PM
Summons Issued as to ATLANTIC COAST ENTERPRISES, LLC, and HIALEAH SQUARE GP. (caw) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 04/23 3:14 PM
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (caw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/23 11:47 AM
COMPLAINT against ATLANTIC COAST ENTERPRISES, LLC, HIALEAH SQUARE GP. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17470280, filed by Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo.(Virues, Beverly) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) |