In Re: Sunset Yachts, Inc
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cecilia M Altonaga |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21536 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 46:0185 Petition by vessel owner for limitation of liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Petitioner
Sunset Yachts, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Mon 04/29 11:31 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sunset Yachts, Inc, filed by Sunset Yachts, Inc.(Dunleavy, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 04/24 8:32 AM
ORDER dismissing1 Complaint, filed by Sunset Yachts, Inc.; Amended Complaint due by 4/29/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/23/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1) |
|
3 | 3
order
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Tue 04/23 2:26 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Documents Improperly Arranged. The Filer did not properly attach the Exhibit . Future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Civil Case Opening Guide. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (nwn) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 04/23 2:21 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/23 12:41 PM
COMPLAINT against Sunset Yachts, Inc. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17470589, filed by Sunset Yachts, Inc.(Dunleavy, Jonathan) (nwn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Att: 2 (4/23/2024) Exhibit Ad Interim Stipulation of Value and Stipulation for Costs |