New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:24-cv-05499
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 20, 2024 5:38 AM EDT
Defendant
JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC
Defendant
KENVUE INC
Defendant
LLT MANAGEMENT LLC
In Re
JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff
RICK DAMATO
Represented By
WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
Plaintiff
ESTATE OF VERONICA DAMATO
Represented By
WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info


Docket last updated: 69 minutes ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/16 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC (BRENNAN, JESSICA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 04/24 9:07 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC, KENVUE INC, LLT MANAGEMENT LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht)
Related: [-]
mdl MDL Direct File Wed 04/24 9:24 AM
Member Case Direct File on 4/23/2024, for MDL 2738 (kht)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/23 12:20 PM
COMPLAINT against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC, KENVUE INC, LLT MANAGEMENT LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15308656) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RICK DAMATO, ESTATE OF VERONICA DAMATO.(BLAIR, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet