Eslampour v. Sanders et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | M James Lorenz |
Referred: | Daniel E Butcher |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00723 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Immigration: Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 11:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
Antony Blinken
Secretary of the U.S. Department of State The Executive Office, Office of the Legal Adviser
Suite 5.600, 600 19th St. NW, DC 20522 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert P. Sanders
Washington, DC 20522
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marybeth Turner
Washington, DC 20522
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Massoud Reza Eslampour
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/25 1:33 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axc1) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/23 10:01 AM
PETITION against Antony Blinken, Robert P. Sanders, Marybeth Turner ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18781467.), filed by Massoud Reza Eslampour. The new case number is 3:24-cv-723-L-DEB. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case. (Goldstein, Joshua)(axc1) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/23/2024) (axc1). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/23/2024) (axc1) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |