LIVINGSTON v. STATE OF MAINE et al
Maine District Court | |
Judge: | John A Woodcock, Jr |
Referred: | Karen Frink Wolf |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00138 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 2:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
STATE OF MAINE
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL 6 STATE HOUSE STATION
AUGUSTA, ME 04333 |
|
Defendant
US GOVERNMENT
|
|
Notice Only Party
MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - NON PRISONER IFP CASES
|
|
Plaintiff
JIMMIE LIVINGSTON, JR
629 TRI-CITY ROAD SOMERSWORTH
STRAFFORD, NH 03878 |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment
Fri 04/26 11:37 AM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL By DEPUTY CLERK: Joanne McCue. (jam) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Recusal
Fri 04/26 11:35 AM
MOTION for Recusal by JIMMIE LIVINGSTON, JR (jam) |
|
11 | 11
3
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendations Order on Objection to Scheduling Order
Fri 04/26 10:28 AM
ORDER ON RECOMMENDED DECISION accepting5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION; dismissing1 Complaint; dismissing6 Amended Complaint to make change & incorporate into the original Complaint. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Recusal
Fri 04/26 10:13 AM
MOTION for Recusal by JIMMIE LIVINGSTON, JR (jam) (jam) |
|
Att: 1 (4/26/2024) duplicative filing of ECF 6 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Recusal
Fri 04/26 10:14 AM
ORDER denying9 Motion for Recusal. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jam) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Recusal
Fri 04/26 11:35 AM
ORDER denying12 Motion for Recusal. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jam) |
||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Additional Attachments
Thu 04/25 11:49 AM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by JIMMIE LIVINGSTON, JR re6 Objection to Recommended Decision. Main Document: Duplicative copy of objection and case law.(jam) Modified on 4/25/2024 to reflect event change of ECF 6 (jam) |
|
Att: 1 email containing document for filing | ||
6 | 6
motion
Objection to Scheduling Order
Thu 04/25 11:46 AM
Objection to Recommended Decision, filed by JIMMIE LIVINGSTON, JR.(jam) Modified on 4/25/2024 to change event type to objection, per request of Judge Woodcock, Jr. (jam) |
|
Att: 1 email containing document for filing | ||
misc
Notice of Docket Entry Modification
Thu 04/25 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding6 OBJECTION to Recommended Decision,7 Additional Attachments, : Event type was changed from Amended Complaint to Objection to Recommended Decision at the request of U.S. District Judge John A. Woodcock, Jr. (jam) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Report and Recommended Decision
Wed 04/24 12:57 PM
RECOMMENDED DECISION AFTER PRELIMINARY REVIEW re1 Complaint. Objections to R&R due by 5/8/2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (MGW) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN) | |
3 | 3
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs
Tue 04/23 2:23 PM
MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs by JIMMIE LIVINGSTON, JR (cjd) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/23 2:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cjd) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/23 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT against STATE OF MAINE, US GOVERNMENT with Jury Demand, filed by JIMMIE LIVINGSTON, JR. (Service of Process Deadline 7/22/2024)(cjd) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs
Tue 04/23 4:07 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN) |