LEIGH v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Maine District Court | |
Judge: | Nancy Torresen |
Referred: | Karen Frink Wolf |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00137 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 05/03 6:26 PM
CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David F. Chermol filed by DAVID F. CHERMOL on behalf of ERIKA FAY LEIGH (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number AMEDC-2949425.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov (CHERMOL, DAVID) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/24 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY S. BOLEN on behalf of SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER (BOLEN, TIMOTHY) |
|
notice
SS Notice of Service
Wed 04/24 8:43 AM
NOTICE of Service: AUSA ANDREW K. LIZOTTE has been added to the docket for service and notice purposes only. Pursuant to Social Security Supplemental Rule 3, the Court has electronically sent notice to the United States Attorney for the District of Maine that a Complaint against the Commissioner of Social Security was filed in this case. Pursuant to Social Security Supplemental Rule 4 the Commissioner's Answer is due within 60 days after notice. Answer due by 6/24/2024. (slg) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs
Tue 04/23 10:54 AM
MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs by ERIKA FAY LEIGH (cjd) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/23 10:53 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cjd) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/23 10:53 AM
COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER, filed by ERIKA FAY LEIGH.(cjd) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs
Tue 04/23 3:11 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN) |