Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert J White
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:24-cv-11074
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2024
Terminated:Mar 04, 2025
Case in other court:Wayne County Circuit Court, 24-005251-NO
Last checked: Sunday Oct 20, 2024 5:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Derrick Coleman
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Messing
Giarmarco Mullins & Horton
contact info
Katherine E. Ross
Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.
contact info
Timothy J. Mullins
Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
River Rouge School District
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Messing
Giarmarco Mullins & Horton
contact info
Katherine E. Ross
Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.
contact info
Timothy J. Mullins
Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Mark White
Represented By
David A. Nacht
Nachtlaw, PC
contact info
Defendant
Supervisors Jane/John Doe
Defendant
River Rouge School Board
Represented By
Timothy J. Mullins
Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Willie L. White
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Messing
Giarmarco Mullins & Horton
contact info
Katherine E. Ross
Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.
contact info
Timothy J. Mullins
Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Moriyah Hamell
Represented By
Renette Jackson
Renette Jackson Attorney At Law, Pllc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
26 26 2 pgs service Acknowledgment Tue 03/18 11:01 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Wayne County Circuit Court of receipt of25 Notice of Remand. (DPer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
25 25 1 pgs notice Remand* Wed 03/05 12:00 PM
NOTICE remanding case to WAYNE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT. (JPar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
24 24 10 pgs order Remanding Case Wed 03/05 11:59 AM
ORDER REMANDING CASE to Wayne County Circuit Court. Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. (JPar)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 10/21 3:18 PM
REPLY to Response re20 Second MOTION to Dismiss filed by Derrick Coleman, River Rouge School Board, River Rouge School District, Willie L. White. (Mullins, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
22 22 notice Practice Guidelines Thu 10/17 3:57 PM
Notice of District Judge Robert J. White's Case Management Requirements. (TVil)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
21 21 respm Response to Motion Mon 10/07 11:48 AM
RESPONSE to20 Second MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Jackson, Renette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
20 20 motion Dismiss Wed 08/28 11:14 AM
Second MOTION to Dismiss by Derrick Coleman, River Rouge School Board, River Rouge School District, Willie L. White. (Mullins, Timothy) Modified on 8/28/2024 (ABun).[ DOCUMENT TITLED MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(c)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
order Text-Only Reassignment Tue 08/13 10:02 AM
Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge Shalina D. Kumar in Flint to District Judge Robert J. White in Detroit pursuant to Administrative Order 24-AO-020. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by River Rouge School District, Derrick Coleman from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 24-005251-NO. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9763286 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Mullins, Timothy)
Related: [-]
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (MSyl)
Related: [-]