Oklahoma Eastern District Court
Judge:Gerald L Jackson
Case #: 6:24-cv-00143
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 20, 2024 4:32 AM CDT
Defendant
James Roberts
Represented By
Colleen Morris
Helton Law Firm
contact info
Chad M. Neuens
Cmn Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info
Sean M. McKelvey
Steidley & Neal, Pllc (mcalester)
contact info
Eli C. Bland
Steidley & Neal, Pllc (mcalester)
contact info
Meaghen E. Clark
Steidley & Neal, Pllc (mcalester)
contact info
Defendant
Patrick Sampson
Represented By
Sean M. McKelvey
Steidley & Neal, Pllc (mcalester)
contact info
Eli C. Bland
Steidley & Neal, Pllc (mcalester)
contact info
Meaghen E. Clark
Steidley & Neal, Pllc (mcalester)
contact info
Defendant
Dalton Self
Represented By
Sean M. McKelvey
Steidley & Neal, Pllc (mcalester)
contact info
Eli C. Bland
Steidley & Neal, Pllc (mcalester)
contact info
Meaghen E. Clark
Steidley & Neal, Pllc (mcalester)
contact info
Defendant
Wagoner, City of
Represented By
Sean M. McKelvey
Steidley & Neal, Pllc (mcalester)
contact info
Eli C. Bland
Steidley & Neal, Pllc (mcalester)
contact info
Meaghen E. Clark
Steidley & Neal, Pllc (mcalester)
contact info
Defendant
Gayla Wright
Represented By
Sean M. McKelvey
Steidley & Neal, Pllc (mcalester)
contact info
Eli C. Bland
Steidley & Neal, Pllc (mcalester)
contact info
Meaghen E. Clark
Steidley & Neal, Pllc (mcalester)
contact info
Plaintiff
Janna M. Metzger
Represented By
Christopher U. Brecht
Smolen Law, PLLC
contact info
Michael F. Smith
Smolen Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tammy Ann Serka
Represented By
Christopher U. Brecht
Smolen Law, PLLC
contact info
Michael F. Smith
Smolen Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago
Friday, December 13, 2024
30 30 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 12/13 4:31 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by Janna M. Metzger, Tammy Ann Serka (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
29 29 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 06/18 12:22 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Colleen Morris on behalf of James Roberts (Morris, Colleen)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 06/18 12:20 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Chad M. Neuens on behalf of James Roberts (Neuens, Chad)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
27 27 order 13 - Settlement Conference Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Hearing(s) Mon 06/10 4:00 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson setting Settlement Conference for 3/19/2025 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. Settlement Conference Statements must be submitted by 3/5/2025. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
26 26 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Strike/Terminate Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Fri 06/07 12:11 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson setting Scheduling Order dates: Amended Pleadings due by 6/26/2024; Joinder of Parties due by 6/26/2024; Exhibit List due by 10/25/2024; Witness List due by 10/25/2024; Discovery due by 2/28/2025; Dispositive Motions due by 3/11/2025; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/21/2025; Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 8/6/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2025 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 327, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson. Jury Trial set for 8/19/2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson. Further, The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/12/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson is hereby STRICKEN. (daw, Chambers)
Related: [-]
25 25 order 09 - MO re Consent to Magistrate Judge by Joint Status Report Fri 06/07 9:15 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson: The parties have expressly indicated in the Joint Status Report signed by an authorized representative of each party in this case that they wish to consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge assigned to this case. As a result, this case is deemed CONSENTED TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE without the necessity for the filing or submission of any other documentation. The United States Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over this case through and including trial and the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(c)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(a). (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
24 24 misc Joint Status Report per Local Rule 16.1 Thu 06/06 5:46 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Janna M. Metzger, Tammy Ann Serka (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/16 3:09 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint Related [+] by James Roberts, Patrick Sampson, Dalton Self, Wagoner, City of, Gayla Wright (Clark, Meaghen)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
22 22 notice Appearance - Attorney Thu 05/16 2:58 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Meaghen E. Clark on behalf of All Defendants (Clark, Meaghen)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Appearance - Attorney Thu 05/16 2:56 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Eli C. Bland on behalf of All Defendants (Bland, Eli)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Appearance - Attorney Thu 05/16 2:54 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sean M. McKelvey on behalf of All Defendants (McKelvey, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
19 19 order 01 - Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Hearing(s) Directing - Parties to File Joint Status Report Tue 05/14 3:24 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 6/12/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson. Counsel should inform Paige Bruce at Paige_Bruce@oked.uscourts.gov by 6/10/2024 at 4:30 PM of a telephone number where they may be reached, should it be different from the number of record in the case. Parties directed to file Joint Status Report by 6/6/2024. (daw, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling Order,
Att: 2 Consent/Reassignment Form
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
18 18 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 05/07 2:20 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher U. Brecht on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brecht, Christopher)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/07 2:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Patrick Sampson - Served on 4/25/2024. by Janna M. Metzger; Tammy Ann Serka (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/07 2:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: James Roberts - Served on 4/25/2024. by Janna M. Metzger; Tammy Ann Serka (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/07 2:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Gayla Wright - Served on 4/25/2024. by Janna M. Metzger; Tammy Ann Serka (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/07 2:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Dalton Self - Served on 4/25/2024. by Janna M. Metzger; Tammy Ann Serka (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/07 2:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Wagoner, City of - Served on 4/25/2024. by Janna M. Metzger; Tammy Ann Serka (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement (FRCvP 7.1) Mon 04/29 10:57 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tammy Ann Serka (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement (FRCvP 7.1) Mon 04/29 10:56 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Janna M. Metzger (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
10 10 service Summons Issued Wed 04/24 2:09 PM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Patrick Sampson.(jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 04/24 2:08 PM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to James Roberts.(jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 04/24 2:07 PM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Gayla Wright.(jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 04/24 2:06 PM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Dalton Self.(jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 04/24 2:05 PM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Wagoner, City of.(jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
misc Filing Fee Paid in Full - CV Tue 04/23 11:17 AM
FILING FEES Paid in Full on 4/23/2024 in the amount of $405, receipt number AOKEDC-1935816 Related [+] by Janna M. Metzger, Tammy Ann Serka (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
Monday, April 22, 2024
5 5 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Parties to File Disclosure Statements Tue 04/23 11:00 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Applicable parties are directed to file Disclosure Statements per FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Court's website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Submission of Notice of Consent or DJO in Magistrate Assigned Cases Tue 04/23 10:59 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: The parties are advised that this case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial should all parties consent to jurisdiction. Consent or election of a District Judge Option may be exercised by completing the Consent Form (Civil Case Originally Assigned to Magistrate Judge) on this Court's website at[LINK:https://www.oked.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil] in accordance with the procedure outlined therein. If a party does not wish to consent to such jurisdiction, they must complete the Reassignment section. Completed forms should be submitted in PDF format to Consents_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov within twenty-one days. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - New CV Case Fee Payment Tue 04/23 10:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $405 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. (Filing Fee due by 4/29/2024) Related [+] (rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
2 2 26 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/23 10:57 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Janna M. Metzger, Tammy Ann Serka. (rak, Deputy Clerk) (rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/23/2024) Exhibit 1 - Metzger Employment Discrimination Complaint,
Att: 2 (4/23/2024) Exhibit 2 - Skeen Employment Discrimination Complaint,
Att: 3 (4/23/2024) Exhibit 3 - Metzger Charge of Discrimination (EEOC Form 5),
Att: 4 (4/23/2024) Exhibit 4 - Skeen Charge of Discrimination (EEOC Form 5),
Att: 5 (4/23/2024) Exhibit 5 - Responses to Metzger's Allegations,
Att: 6 (4/23/2024) Exhibit 6 - Responses to Skeen's Allegations,
Att: 7 (4/23/2024) Exhibit 7 - Metzger's Rebuttals,
Att: 8 (4/23/2024) Exhibit 8 - Skeen's Rebuttals,
Att: 9 (4/23/2024) Exhibit 9 - Metzer Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 10 (4/23/2024) Exhibit 10 - Skeen Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 11 (4/23/2024) Exhibit 11 - Investigation of EMS operations (March 31, 2018),
Att: 12 (4/23/2024) Exhibit 12 - Report of Investigation of EMS operations (Sept. 2, 2021),
Att: 13 (4/23/2024) Exhibit 13 - Wagoner EMS Report by Rick Bronson (February 14, 2022),
Att: 14 (4/23/2024) Exhibit 14 - Wagoner EMS Report by Rick Bronson (March 1, 2022)
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/23 10:56 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Janna M. Metzger, Tammy Ann Serka. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]