California Northern District Court
Judge:Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Case #: 3:24-cv-02411
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 20, 2024 2:12 AM PDT
Defendant
CrossCountry Mortgage, LLC
Represented By
Dominique N. Thomas
Lewis Brisbois
contact info
Defendant
LendUS, LLC
Represented By
Michael Benjamin Sachs
Clark Hill LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Barbara Greist
Represented By
Paolo Chagas Meireles
Shavitz Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Benjamin Galdston
Omnum Law Apc
contact info
Tamra Carsten Givens
Morgan And Morgan
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan Schell
Represented By
Paolo Chagas Meireles
Shavitz Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Benjamin Galdston
Omnum Law Apc
contact info
Tamra Carsten Givens
Morgan And Morgan
contact info
Plaintiff
Melanie Green
Represented By
Paolo Chagas Meireles
Shavitz Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Benjamin Galdston
Omnum Law Apc
contact info
Tamra Carsten Givens
Morgan And Morgan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
67 67 misc Transcript Order Thu 05/08 8:11 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin by Barbara Greist, for Recorded Proceeding - San Francisco. (Meireles, Paolo)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
66 66 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 05/05 3:38 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] DEFENDANT LENDUS, LLCS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL COLLECTIVE ACTION CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE PURSUANT TO SECTION 216(B) OF THE FLSA filed byLendUS, LLC.(Sachs, Michael)
Related: [-] 40 Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Katrina Merritt In Support of Defendandant LendUS, LLC's Opposition to Plaintifs' Corrected Motion for Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(B) of the FLSA