Premark Health Science, Inc. v. PlantFuel, Inc. et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Scott T Varholak |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01117 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 2:07 PM MDT |
Defendant
PlantFuel Life, Inc.
14143 Denver West Parkway
Golden, CO 80401 |
|
Defendant
PlantFuel, Inc.
14143 Denver West Parkway #100
Golden, CO 80401 |
|
Defendant
Brad Pyatt
14143 Denver West Parkway #100
Golden, CO 80401 |
|
Plaintiff
Premark Health Science, Inc.
3200 Story Road
Irving, TX 75038 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/24 4:39 PM
ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction Form and Setting Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/24/2024. Consent Form due by 5/22/2024 . Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/29/2024 . Scheduling Conference set for 6/5/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (schap, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear
Tue 04/23 4:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear by Plaintiff Premark Health Science, Inc.. (Hutchisson, Matthew) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Tue 04/23 3:09 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued. (efoga, ) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Tue 04/23 3:09 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2
Tue 04/23 3:01 PM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re:2 Corporate Disclosure Statement,1 Complaint, filed by attorney James R. Gourley. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (efoga, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/23 1:51 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Gourley, James) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/23 1:48 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9651439)Attorney James Robert Gourley added to party Premark Health Science, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Premark Health Science, Inc..(Gourley, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet |