California Eastern District Court
Judge:Dena M Coggins
Case #: 2:24-cv-01179
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 20, 2024 2:11 AM PDT
Defendant
Juvia's Place LLC
Plaintiff
Leticia Nyberg
Represented By
Benjamin Heikali
Treehouse Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kerriann Salmon
Represented By
Benjamin Heikali
Treehouse Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nikelle Suarez
Represented By
Benjamin Heikali
Treehouse Law LLP
contact info

GPO Nov 15 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/14/24 VACATING 7 Clerk's Entry of Default against Defendant Juvia's Place LLC; defendant shall respond to the Complaint by 01/07/25. (Benson, A.)

Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
26 26 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 04/30 5:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued on 4/30/2025 by the Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dena M. Coggins: On 4/29/2025, the parties filed a25 Stipulation extending Defendant Juvia's Place, LLC's time to respond to the1 Complaint. Pursuant to that Stipulation and good cause appearing, Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint by no later than 6/6/2025. (Text Only Entry) (Deputy Clerk CRS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
25 25 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 04/29 1:20 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Extending Defendants Deadline to Respond to Complaint to June 6, 2025 by Juvia's Place LLC. (Anderson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 17, 2025
24 24 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 04/17 3:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued on 4/15/2025 by the Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dena M. Coggins: On 4/15/2025, the parties filed a23 Stipulation requesting a 60-day extension of the deadline for the parties to file their Joint Status Report regarding scheduling, from 4/22/2025 to 6/20/2025. Having considered the parties' request and good cause appearing, the court GRANTS the requested extension of time and DIRECTS the parties to file their Joint Status Report regarding scheduling by no later than 6/20/2025. (Text Only Entry) (Deputy Clerk CRS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
23 23 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 04/15 3:42 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Parties to File Joint Status Report by Juvia's Place LLC. (Anderson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Extending Time for Parties to File Joint Status Report
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
22 22 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 04/08 9:19 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued on 4/8/2025 by the Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dena M. Coggins: On 3/28/2025, the parties filed a21 Stipulation to extend time for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's1 Complaint. Pursuant to that Stipulation and good cause appearing, Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint by no later than 5/7/2025. (Text Only Entry) (Deputy Clerk CRS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
21 21 misc Stipulation Fri 03/28 10:37 AM
STIPULATION for EXTENTION of TIME to Respond to Complaint by Juvia's Place LLC.(Anderson, Joshua) Modified on 3/30/2025 (KML)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 27, 2025
20 20 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 02/27 10:22 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued on 2/27/2025 by the Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dena M. Coggins: On 2/26/2025, the parties filed a19 Stipulation to extend the time for Defendant to respond to Plaintiffs'1 Complaint. Pursuant to that Stipulation and good cause appearing, Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by no later than 4/7/2025. (Text Only Entry) (Deputy Clerk CRS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
19 19 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 02/26 2:36 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Extending Defendant Juvias Place, LLCs Time to Respond to Complaint re1 Complaint, 18 Minute Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings, by Juvia's Place LLC. (Anderson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation
Friday, January 31, 2025
18 18 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 01/31 1:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued on 1/31/2025 by the Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dena M. Coggins: On 1/30/2025, the parties filed a17 Stipulation to extend the time for Defendant to respond to Plaintiffs'1 Complaint. Pursuant to that Stipulation and good cause appearing, Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by no later than 3/6/2025. (Text Only Entry) (Deputy Clerk CRS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
17 17 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 01/30 12:26 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Defendant Juvias Place, LLCs Time to Respond to Complaint re12 Stipulation,1 Complaint, by Juvia's Place LLC. (Anderson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
16 16 misc Civil New Case Documents for DC Wed 01/08 9:55 AM
AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Joint Status Report Filing Deadline: 4/22/2025 (Deputy Clerk VLK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
15 15 misc Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case Wed 01/08 9:54 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Dena M. Coggins and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:24cv-1179 DC CKD. (Deputy Clerk VLK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
14 14 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Tue 01/07 1:41 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Heikali, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
13 13 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Mon 01/06 5:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Chief Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/6/2025: This case was filed on 4/23/2024 and assigned solely to the undersigned pursuant to Appendix A of the court's Local Rules. Under the Initial Scheduling Order, all parties were to inform the Clerk of Court of their decision whether to Consent or Decline magistrate judge jurisdiction for all purposes in this case by filing their Consent/Decline form (ECF No. 3-1) within 90 days of the date the action was filed. ECF No.3 . A review of the docket indicates that no Consent/Decline forms have yet been submitted. There is no obligation to consent, and no judge will be notified of a party's decision unless all parties have consented. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1). Therefore, no later than 1/17/2025, all parties SHALL file their Consent/Decline form. SO ORDERED. (Text Only Entry) (Deputy Clerk LMK)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Stipulation Mon 01/06 4:18 PM
STIPULATION (Initial) Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint for No More Than 28 Days by Juvia's Place LLC. (Anderson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/20 10:11 AM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Joshua E. Anderson on behalf of Juvia's Place LLC. Attorney Anderson, Joshua E. added. (Anderson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
10 10 order Stipulation and Order Fri 11/15 9:05 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/14/24 VACATING7 Clerk's Entry of Default against Defendant Juvia's Place LLC; defendant shall respond to the Complaint by 01/07/25. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
9 9 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 11/12 1:45 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER VACATING DEFAULT AND REGARDING DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Juvia's Place LLC. Attorney Racs, Kaylee added. (Racs, Kaylee)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 11/11 12:03 PM
WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Juvia's Place LLC on 11/8/2024, Answer due 1/7/2025 (Anderson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
7 7 order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 06/13 4:59 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Juvia's Place LLC* (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
6 6 misc Request for Entry of Default Wed 06/12 2:50 PM
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Juvia's Place LLC by Nikelle Suarez, Kerriann Salmon, Leticia Nyberg. (Heikali, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/30 9:29 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Juvia's Place LLC served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024. (Heikali, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
4 4 service Summons Tue 04/23 12:54 PM
(DISREGARD, issued in error, REFER to2 SUMMONS ISSUED) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Juvia's Place LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Craig B. Sanders* *Sanders Law Group* *333 Earle Ovington Boulevard, Suite 402* *Uniondale, NY 11553*. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 4/23/2024 (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider Tue 04/23 12:37 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
2 2 service Summons Tue 04/23 12:36 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Juvia's Place LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Benjamin Heikali* *Treehouse Law, LLP* *2121 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 2580* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]
1 1 40 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/23 10:47 AM
COMPLAINT against Juvia's Place LLC by Nikelle Suarez, Kerriann Salmon, Leticia Nyberg. Attorney Heikali, Benjamin added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11482998)(Heikali, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet