Liang et al v. Mayorkas et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Roger T Benitez |
Referred: | Steve B Chu |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00724 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:0702 Administrative Procedure Act - Right of Review |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 2:10 PM PDT |
Defendant
Attorney General Merrick B. Garland
U.S. Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20530 |
|
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
|
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
|
Plaintiff
Jiacheng Liang
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Xiya Shi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order re Pro Hac Vice Application
Wed 05/01 10:35 AM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Sadaf F. Ahmed, re3 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/29/2024.(exs) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 8:29 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-18798106.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Ahmed, Sadaf) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/25 9:32 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axc1) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/23 11:22 AM
COMPLAINT FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18780944.), filed by Jiacheng Liang, Xiya Shi. The new case number is 3:24-cv-724-BEN-SBC. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu are assigned to the case. (Minas, Arthur)(axc1) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 1, | ||
Att: 3 2, | ||
Att: 4 3 |