Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Katherine A Crytzer
Referred: Christopher H Steger
Case #: 1:24-cv-00159
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause05:75(2) Contract - Reduction in Grade
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2024
Terminated:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 20, 2024 5:54 AM EDT
Defendant
Christopher Hampton
7619 Hixson Pike
Hixon, TN 37343
Defendant
Mitchell Horner
71 Jada Lane
Ringgold, GA 30736
Defendant
Sport Pontoons, LLC
7619 Hixson Pike
Hixson, TN 37343
Defendant
Tarzan Boat, LLC
7619 Hixson Pike
Hixon, TN 37343
Defendant
Brianna Weaver
7619 Hixson Pike
Hixon, TN 37343
Plaintiff
Andrew Siffert
17692 83rd Ave N
Maple Grove, MN 55311
Represented By
Scott Raymond Maucere
Maucere LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, November 14, 2024
10 10 order Judgment Thu 11/14 11:48 AM
JUDGMENT re 9 Order Dismissing Action Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 11/14/2024. (MKM)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 11/14 11:45 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 11/14/2024. (MKM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 11/06 11:44 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why the Court should not dismiss this action without prejudice under Rule 4(m). Plaintiff shall file a response on or before 11/13/2024 . Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 11/6/2024. (MKM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Citizenship Thu 04/25 4:12 PM
Certificate of Citizenship by Andrew Siffert. (Maucere, Scott)
Related: [-]
6 6 5 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Thu 04/25 9:05 AM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 4/25/2024. (JCK)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Thu 04/25 9:04 AM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 4/25/2024. (JCK)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Thu 04/25 9:04 AM
Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 4/25/2024. (JCK)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 04/25 7:33 AM
Summons Issued as to Christopher Hampton, Mitchell Horner, Sport Pontoons, LLC, Tarzan Boat, LLC, Brianna Weaver.(JCK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Tarzan Boat, LLC,
Att: 2 Summons Christopher Hampton,
Att: 3 Summons Mitchell Horner,
Att: 4 Summons Brianna Weaver
notice Notice of Failure to File Certificate of Citizenship Thu 04/25 7:34 AM
NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Citizenship in a diversity case as required by FRCP 7.1 by Andrew Siffert. (JCK)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 04/25 9:02 AM
District Judge Katherine A Crytzer and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (JCK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
2 2 order Order Wed 04/24 2:35 PM
ORDER: ORDER RELATING CASES. Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to 1:22-cv-00272-KAC-CHS. The Court finds that these cases arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Therefore, the two cases are related. See E.D. Tenn. L.R. 3.2(d)(3)(A)(1). Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Crytzer and Magistrate Judge Steger, this case will also be assigned to those same judges. However, consolidation is not ordered. This entry is the complete order of the Court. No document is attached.Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 4-24-24. (KMG)
Related: [-]
misc Public Docket Annotation Wed 04/24 9:17 AM
This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Steger's chambers for related case determination. (AGG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/23 4:17 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5656858.), filed by Andrew Siffert.(Maucere, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Brianna Weaver,
Att: 2 Summons Christopher Hampton,
Att: 3 Summons Mitchell Horner,
Att: 4 Summons Sport Pontoons,
Att: 5 Summons Tarzan Boat,
Att: 6 Exhibit A,
Att: 7 Exhibit B,
Att: 8 Exhibit C,
Att: 9 Exhibit D,
Att: 10 Exhibit E,
Att: 11 Exhibit F,
Att: 12 Exhibit G