Alaska District Court
Judge:H Russel Holland
Case #: 3:24-cv-00091
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause46:741 Shipping
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2024
Terminated:Mar 13, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court Third Judicial, 3AN-24-04525 CI
Last checked: Sunday Oct 20, 2024 1:10 AM AKDT
Defendant
USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Katherine Kust
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
George M. Cruickshank
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
William Barndt
Represented By
Marion C. Kelly
Law Offices Of Marion C. Kelly
contact info
Jeffrey J. Barber
Barber & Associates, LLC
contact info
Marion Kelly
Self
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, March 13, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/13 9:24 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 3/13/2025. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
26 26 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/12 7:54 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Kust, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 02/11 3:53 PM
ORDER FROM CHAMBERS re24 Notice of Settlement. Appropriate closing papers or status report due on or before March 12, 2025. See order for details. (SCD, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 02/10 8:43 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Kust, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
23 23 trial Witness List Fri 01/10 12:27 PM
Witness List by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Kust, Katherine)
Related: [-]
22 22 trial Witness List Fri 01/10 10:41 AM
Witness List by William Barndt. (Barber, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 12/11 12:15 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. See Order for details. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 12/10 5:38 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Unopposed by William Barndt.(Barber, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 14, 2024
19 19 misc Supplement Fri 06/14 12:53 PM
SUPPLEMENT to Scheduling and Planning Conference Report Regarding Production of Electronically Stored Information by USAA Casualty Insurance Company12 Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines,11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kust, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
18 18 trial Witness List Mon 06/10 4:21 PM
Witness List by William Barndt. (Barber, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 06/10 1:25 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Cruickshank, George)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s) Mon 06/10 12:30 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by USAA Casualty Insurance Company(Cruickshank, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit First Amended Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit Notice of Service of Process,
Att: 6 Exhibit Barber Entry of Appearance
15 15 notice Notice of Service List Mon 06/10 11:00 AM
NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Cruickshank, George)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
14 14 notice Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application Fri 06/07 10:12 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE re13 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine K. Kust, at docket13 , is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov Fri 06/07 6:49 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Katherine K. Kust. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3616252.) by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Kust, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Monday, June 03, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 06/03 2:29 PM
SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/20/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 6/20/2025. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 6/3/2024. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 05/23 12:00 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Barber, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 05/22 3:33 PM
ORDER: Compliance with the foregoing filing requirements shall be achieved by the parties on or before June 3, 2024. Signed by Judge Senior District Judge H. Russel Holland on 5/22/2024. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/14 12:58 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Cruickshank, George)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
8 8 misc Jury Demand Fri 05/10 2:57 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by William Barndt. (Barber, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 05/01 11:02 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer due by May 14, 2024 . (JDS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/30 2:46 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Cruickshank, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 25, 2024
5 5 order Initial Case Status Report Order Thu 04/25 4:24 PM
ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Senior District Judge H Russel Holland on 4/25/2024. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal Wed 04/24 8:26 AM
ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days.. Signed by Judge Senior District Judge H Russel Holland on 04/24/2024. (SXH, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Clerks Notice Wed 04/24 8:14 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to the system of random case assignment, this case has been assigned to the Honorable Senior Judge H. Russel Holland. Please use the following case number for all future filings 3:24-cv-00091-HRH . (SXH, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/23 9:36 PM
Civil Cover Sheet. (Cruickshank, George)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 04/23 9:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA Casualty Insurance Company from Anchorage Superior Court, case number 3AN 24-4525 CI. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AAKDC-3595896), filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Cruickshank, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Declaration