594 East 7th Street, LLC
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-10755 |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
594 East 7th Street, LLC
84 State St
Boston, MA 02109-2202 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Assistant U.S. Trustee
Richard King - B
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109 |
Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago |
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 05/04 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 05/03/2024. (Admin.) |
|
24 | 24
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 05/04 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 05/03/2024. (Admin.) |
|
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 05/04 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 05/03/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
Thu 05/02 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Notice Date 05/01/2024. (Admin.) |
|
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
Wed 05/01 4:30 PM
Proceeding Memorandum and Order dated 5/1/2024 Re:13 Assented to Emergency Motion filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard King to Dismiss Case. GRANTED. See Order for Full Text. (nc) |
|
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Wed 05/01 4:11 PM
Order dated 05/01/2024 Re:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. STATUS CONFERENCE HELD ON APRIL 30, 2024. (nc) |
|
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay
Wed 05/01 1:51 PM
Order dated 5/1/2024 Re:18 Assented to Emergency Motion filed by Creditor FTF Lending, LLC for Immediate and Prospective in Rem Relief from the Automatic Stay and for Dismissal Re: 594 East 7th Street, South Boston, Massachusetts with Request for Limitation of Notice. GRANTED. See Order for Full Text. (nc) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay
Tue 04/30 9:07 AM
Emergency Motion filed by Creditor FTF Lending, LLC for Relief from Stay in Rem Re: 594 East 7th Street, South Boston, Massachusetts with certificate of service Fee Amount $199, Objections due by 05/14/2024. (Doyle, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits | ||
17 | 17
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 04/30 9:04 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jacqueline Doyle with certificate of service filed by Creditor FTF Lending, LLC (Doyle, Jacqueline) |
|
crditcrd
none
Tue 04/30 9:08 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK 24-10755 ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A20455667, amount $ 199.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
court
Hearing Scheduled (Form Attached)
Mon 04/29 8:45 AM
Hearing Scheduled on 4/30/2024 at 12:00 PM at Boston Courtroom 3, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109 Re:13 Assented to Emergency Motion filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard King - B to Dismiss Case. Objections may be raised at the hearing. (mem) |
|
Saturday, April 27, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 04/28 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/27/2024. (Admin.) |
|
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 04/28 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/27/2024. (Admin.) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss Case
Sat 04/27 6:31 PM
Emergency Motion filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard King - B to Dismiss Case with certificate of service. (Sprague, Heather) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order
Sat 04/27 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 04/26/2024. (Admin.) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/26 1:01 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Debtor 594 East 7th Street, LLC (Van Dam, Michael) |
|
10 | 10
utility
Corrective Entry
Fri 04/26 10:25 AM
Order Requiring Corrective Action. You are hereby ORDERED to file the required document(s) identified in the attached order within (2) business days of the date of this order Re:9 Certificate of Service filed by Debtor 594 East 7th Street, LLC.. (nc) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/26 10:02 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Debtor 594 East 7th Street, LLC (Van Dam, Michael) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Thu 04/25 3:35 PM
Order dated 04/25/2024 Re:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. See order for full text. (nc) |
|
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing
Thu 04/25 3:04 PM
Order dated 4/25/2024 Re:6 Motion filed by Debtor 594 East 7th Street, LLC to Advance or Continue Status Hearing [Re:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual]. GRANTED. See Order for Full Text. (nc) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Continue/Cancel Hearing
Thu 04/25 1:56 PM
Motion filed by Debtor 594 East 7th Street, LLC to Continue Hearing [Re:5 Hearing Scheduled] or Advance with certificate of service. (Van Dam, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
court
Hearing Scheduled (Form Attached)
Thu 04/25 8:26 AM
Status Conference Scheduled to be held on 4/30/2024 at 02:00 PM at Boston Courtroom 3, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109 Re:1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 594 East 7th Street, LLC. (mem) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Signature Page
Wed 04/24 2:07 PM
Signature Page filed by Debtor 594 East 7th Street, LLC (Van Dam, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Wed 04/24 2:06 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by Debtor 594 East 7th Street, LLC (Van Dam, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order to Update
Wed 04/24 10:47 AM
Order to Update Re:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. SSN/Tax ID due 4/29/2024. Corporate Vote due by 5/1/2024. Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Due 5/1/2024. Attorney/Debtor Signature Page due 5/1/2024.. Atty Disclosure Statement due 5/8/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 5/8/2024. Schedules A-H due 5/8/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/8/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 5/8/2024. (nc) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
9
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 04/23 6:03 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. with deficiencies. Filing Fee in the Amount of $1738 Filed by 594 East 7th Street, LLC. (Van Dam, Michael) |
|
crditcrd
none
Tue 04/23 6:24 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-10755 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt Number A20447390, amount $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) |