603 Dot Ave, LLC
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-10759 |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
603 Dot Ave, LLC
84 State St
Boston, MA 02109-2202 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Assistant U.S. Trustee
Richard King - B
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109 |
Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago |
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 05/04 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 05/03/2024. (Admin.) |
|
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 05/04 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 05/03/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
Thu 05/02 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Notice Date 05/01/2024. (Admin.) |
|
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
Wed 05/01 4:23 PM
Proceeding Memorandum and Order dated 5/1/2024 Re:9 Assented to Emergency Motion filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard King to Dismiss Case. GRANTED. See Order for Full Text. (nc) |
|
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Wed 05/01 4:03 PM
Order dated 05/01/2024 Re:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. STATUS CONFERENCE HELD ON APRIL 30, 2024. (nc) |
|
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay
Wed 05/01 1:49 PM
Order dated 5/1/2024 Re:13 Emergency Motion filed by Creditor FTF Lending, LLC for Relief from Stay in Rem Re: 603 Dorchester Avenue, South Boston, Massachusetts. GRANTED. See Order for Full Text. (nc) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay
Tue 04/30 10:03 AM
Emergency Motion filed by Creditor FTF Lending, LLC for Relief from Stay in Rem Re: 603 Dorchester Avenue, South Boston, Massachusetts with certificate of service Fee Amount $199, Objections due by 05/14/2024. (Doyle, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits | ||
12 | 12
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 04/30 10:00 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jacqueline Doyle with certificate of service filed by Creditor FTF Lending, LLC (Doyle, Jacqueline) |
|
crditcrd
none
Tue 04/30 10:05 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK 24-10759 ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A20455939, amount $ 199.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
court
Hearing Scheduled (Form Attached)
Mon 04/29 8:52 AM
Hearing Scheduled on 4/30/2024 at 12:00 PM at Boston Courtroom 3, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109 Re:9 Assented to Emergency Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard King. Objections may be raised at the hearing. (mem) |
|
Saturday, April 27, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 04/28 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/27/2024. (Admin.) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss Case
Sat 04/27 4:38 PM
Emergency Motion filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard King - B to Dismiss Case with certificate of service. (Sprague, Heather) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order
Sat 04/27 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 04/26/2024. (Admin.) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/26 1:03 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Debtor 603 Dot Ave, LLC (Van Dam, Michael) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Thu 04/25 3:59 PM
Order dated 04/25/2024 Re:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. See order for full text. (nc) |
|
5 | 5
court
Hearing Scheduled (Form Attached)
Thu 04/25 8:33 AM
Status Conference scheduled to be held on 4/30/2024 at 02:00 PM at Boston Courtroom 3, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109 Re:1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 603 Dot Ave, LLC. (mem) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Signature Page
Wed 04/24 2:13 PM
Signature Page filed by Debtor 603 Dot Ave, LLC (Van Dam, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Wed 04/24 2:12 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by Debtor 603 Dot Ave, LLC (Van Dam, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order to Update
Wed 04/24 11:05 AM
Order to Update Re:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Corporate Vote due by 5/1/2024. Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Due 5/1/2024. Attorney/Debtor Signature Page due 5/1/2024.. Atty Disclosure Statement due 5/8/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 5/8/2024. Schedules A-H due 5/8/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/8/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 5/8/2024. (nc) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
9
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 04/23 6:14 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. with deficiencies. Filing Fee in the Amount of $1738 Filed by 603 Dot Ave, LLC. (Van Dam, Michael) |
|
crditcrd
none
Tue 04/23 6:24 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-10759 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt Number A20447390, amount $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) |