State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. WIN Health Institute, LLC et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Scott T Varholak |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01125 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance) |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 5:12 PM MDT |
Defendant
Nathaniel Gordon
|
|
Defendant
David Jensen
|
|
Defendant
Trisha Markkula
|
|
Defendant
WIN Health Institute, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/29 11:06 AM
ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction Form and Setting Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/29/2024. Consent Form due by 5/23/2024 . Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/30/2024 . Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2024 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (ccuen, ) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Thu 04/25 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeremy Robert Speckhals on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty CompanyAttorney Jeremy Robert Speckhals added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:pla) (Speckhals, Jeremy) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Summons Issued
Wed 04/24 8:19 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (efoga, ) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Wed 04/24 8:04 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Summons Request
Tue 04/23 4:11 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Trisha Markkula re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Kafer, Kelly) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Summons Request
Tue 04/23 4:10 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Nathaniel Gordon re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Kafer, Kelly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Summons Request
Tue 04/23 4:09 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to David Jensen re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Kafer, Kelly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Summons Request
Tue 04/23 4:07 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to WIN Health Institute, LLC re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Kafer, Kelly) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/23 3:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Nathaniel Gordon, David Jensen, Trisha Markkula, WIN Health Institute, LLC (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9652013)Attorney Kelly L. Kafer added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:pla), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Kafer, Kelly) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |