Colorado District Court
Judge:Philip A Brimmer
Case #: 1:24-cv-01121
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 20, 2024 3:13 AM MDT
Defendant
Katie Clemens
Represented By
Daniel Wiley Ray
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Katherine Hoffman
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Nicholas James Deaver
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Kendra K. Smith
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Defendant
Greg Kilcollins
Represented By
Daniel Wiley Ray
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Nicholas James Deaver
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Kendra K. Smith
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jeremy Salazar
Represented By
Daniel Wiley Ray
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Nicholas James Deaver
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Kendra K. Smith
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Defendant
Western Pacific Building Materials
Represented By
Daniel Wiley Ray
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Nicholas James Deaver
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Kendra K. Smith
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dwayne K. Wilson
11000 East Idaho Place
Aurora, CO 80012


Docket last updated: 54 minutes ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
56 56 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Fri 05/02 4:51 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 2 May 2025. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Permit Claims Representative to Appear Remotely at the Settlement Conference54 is GRANTED. Thomas Schneider, the insurance claims representative, may appear by video teleconference (VTC) at the Settlement Conference.(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
55 55 order Memorandum Fri 05/02 2:46 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding54 MOTION for Order to Permit Claims Representative to Appear Remotely at the Settlement Conference filed by Jeremy Salazar, Katie Clemens, Western Pacific Building Materials, Greg Kilcollins. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/02/2025. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
54 54 4 pgs motion Order Fri 05/02 1:52 PM
MOTION for Order to Permit Claims Representative to Appear Remotely at the Settlement Conference by Defendants Western Pacific Building Materials, Greg Kilcollins, Katie Clemens, Jeremy Salazar. (Allen, Tucker)
Related: [-]