New York Southern District Court
Judge:Loretta A Preska
Case #: 1:24-cv-03113
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2024
Terminated:Jul 10, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 20, 2024 5:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Stephanie Mertz
Represented By
Allyesha Hall
Slarskey LLC
contact info
David Neal Slarskey
Slarskey LLC
contact info
Evan Fried
Slarskey LLC
contact info
Defendant
Monica Murthy
Plaintiff
Eisen, Inc.
Represented By
Seth Kalela Kugler
Grellas Shah LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, August 15, 2024
26 26 order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed Thu 08/15 10:24 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL: Plaintiff Eisen, Inc. hereby dismisses this action as against Defendant Stephanie Mertz pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(i) with prejudice and with each party bearing its/her own costs. The above-captioned case against Defendant Mertz is hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the case and mark all pending motions denied as moot. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/15/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Thu 08/15 9:10 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Loretta A. Preska for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety; the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal in a closed case. (nd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/14 2:32 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Stephanie Mertz. Document filed by Eisen, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Kugler, Seth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 07/10 12:00 PM
ORDER: In light of the settlement of the above-captioned case by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron, the Court hereby dismisses all outstanding counts in Plaintiff's Complaint, (see dkt. no. 1). The Clerk of the Court shall mark this action closed, subject to reopening within thirty days if settlement is not effected, and mark all pending motions denied as moot. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to administer the terms of the settlement. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/10/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference Mon 07/01 2:22 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron: Settlement Conference held on 7/1/2024. (kl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
23 23 order Scheduling Order Wed 06/26 1:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: on July 1, 2024, at 9:00 a.m., the parties shall appear for a settlement conference in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl St., NY, NY. Settlement Conference set for 7/1/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron) (Text Only Order) (Aaron, Stewart)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/26 1:18 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Allyesha Hall on behalf of Stephanie Mertz..(Hall, Allyesha)
Related: [-]
21 21 1 pgs order Order Wed 06/26 12:54 PM
ORDER: In light of the order of reference of the above-captioned case to Magistrate Judge Hon. Stewart D. Aaron for a settlement conference, (see dkt. no. 20), the Court hereby orders that Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction, (see dkt. no. 13), and the proposed stipulation and order filed by Plaintiff and Defendant Stephanie Mertz, (see dkt. no. 19), shall be held in abeyance until the conclusion of the settlement conference held before Judge Aaron. The parties shall report to the Court promptly following the conclusion of the settlement conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/26/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 06/26 12:44 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/26/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 06/26 11:51 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Telephone Conference held on 6/26/2024. (mph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
19 19 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Tue 06/25 7:49 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Eisen, Inc...(Kugler, Seth)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/14 9:59 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan Fried on behalf of Stephanie Mertz..(Fried, Evan)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 06/14 2:10 AM
DECLARATION of Shawn Kerr in Support re:13 FIRST MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against Stephanie Mertz .. Document filed by Eisen, Inc...(Kugler, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Kerr CV
16 16 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 06/14 2:08 AM
DECLARATION of Allen Osgood in Support re:13 FIRST MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against Stephanie Mertz .. Document filed by Eisen, Inc...(Kugler, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Mertz CIIAA,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Mertz/Murthy Slack Logs,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Google Activity Log,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - April 15 Messages to Mertz and Murthy,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - GitHub Screenshot,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Mertz Text to Osgood,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Emails With Mertz
15 15 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 06/14 2:03 AM
DECLARATION of Seth K. Kugler in Support re:13 FIRST MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against Stephanie Mertz .. Document filed by Eisen, Inc...(Kugler, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - April 26 Email and Letter to Mertz,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - April 30 Email With Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - April 29 Emails With Mertz,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - May 2 Email from Mertz's Counsel,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - May 4 Letter to Mertz's Counsel,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Email Thread With Mertz's Counsel
14 14 25 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 06/14 1:48 AM
FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:13 FIRST MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against Stephanie Mertz . . Document filed by Eisen, Inc...(Kugler, Seth)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 06/14 1:44 AM
FIRST MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against Stephanie Mertz . Document filed by Eisen, Inc...(Kugler, Seth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
12 12 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 06/13 12:35 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: Plaintiff Eisen, Inc. ("Plaintiff") and Defendant Stephanie Mertz ("Defendant Mertz"), by and through the undersigned attorneys for the respective parties stipulate as follows: 1. The time for Defendant Mertz to respond to the Complaint in this matter is extended up to and including June 28, 2024. 2. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts, and signatures submitted by facsimile or email shall be deemed originals for the purpose of this Stipulation. So Ordered. Stephanie Mertz answer due 6/28/2024. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/13/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Thu 06/13 10:27 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Stephanie Mertz..(Fried, Evan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/12 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Neal Slarskey on behalf of Stephanie Mertz..(Slarskey, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 06/06 1:47 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Monica Murthy served on 5/14/2024, answer due 6/4/2024. Service was accepted by Monica Murthy, Defendant. Document filed by Eisen, Inc...(Kugler, Seth)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 06/06 1:40 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Stephanie Mertz served on 5/16/2024, answer due 6/6/2024. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Eisen, Inc...(Kugler, Seth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 04/24 9:32 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stephanie Mertz..(jgo)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 04/24 9:32 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Monica Murthy..(jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 04/24 9:30 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 04/24 9:31 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 04/24 9:31 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
5 5 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/23 7:56 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Monica Murthy, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Eisen, Inc...(Kugler, Seth)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/23 7:54 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stephanie Mertz, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Eisen, Inc...(Kugler, Seth)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/23 7:45 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Eisen, Inc...(Kugler, Seth)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/23 7:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kugler, Seth)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/23 7:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Stephanie Mertz, Monica Murthy. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29262592)Document filed by Eisen, Inc...(Kugler, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Mertz CIIAA,
Att: 2 Exhibit Murthy CIIAA,
Att: 3 Exhibit Mertz Termination Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit Murthy Termination Letter