Young v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Donald M Middlebrooks |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-14121 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 1:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
|
|
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Goldman Sachs Bank USA
|
|
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Dawn Young
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 04/30 1:51 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Deborah Dawn Young. Goldman Sachs Bank USA served on 4/26/2024, response/answer due 5/17/2024. (Gomez, Octavio) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Mon 04/29 9:28 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Deborah Dawn Young. Trans Union LLC served on 4/26/2024, response/answer due 5/17/2024. (Gomez, Octavio) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/29 8:37 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Ruiz, Maria) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 04/29 8:28 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Maria Helena Ruiz on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Attorney Maria Helena Ruiz added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft). (Ruiz, Maria) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 04/26 10:41 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Deborah Dawn Young. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 4/26/2024, response/answer due 6/25/2024. (Gomez, Octavio) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions
Thu 04/25 3:45 PM
Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Deborah Dawn Young (Gomez, Octavio) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/25 3:44 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Deborah Dawn Young (Gomez, Octavio) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/24 11:03 AM
Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Goldman Sachs Bank USA, Trans Union LLC. (nan) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 04/24 10:57 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/23 6:58 PM
COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Goldman Sachs Bank USA, Trans Union LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17472573, filed by Deborah Dawn Young.(Gomez, Octavio) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) Proposed Summons EQ, | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) Proposed Summons EXP, | ||
Att: 4 Summon(s) Proposed Summons TU, | ||
Att: 5 Summon(s) Proposed Summons GS |