BIRCHINGTON, LLC et al v. SSHCOF II WASHINGTON DC, LLC et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Randolph D Moss |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01193 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 1:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
KINSLEY CONSTRUCTION, INC.
CT Corporation System 1015 15th Street, NW Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005 |
|
Defendant
PEACHTREE GROUP d/b/a PEACHTREE HOTEL GROUP II, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SSHCOF II WASHINGTON DC, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JAMES VAN HORN
|
|
Plaintiff
BIRCHINGTON, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
HABTE SEQUAR
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/24 1:59 PM
NOTICE by KINSLEY CONSTRUCTION, INC. re 4 Motion for Order,1 Notice of Removal, (Schwartz, Joshua) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Wed 04/24 1:00 PM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by BIRCHINGTON, LLC, HABTE SEQUAR. (Peacock, Stuart) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Motion For Order
Wed 04/24 12:47 PM
MOTION for Order Referring Case to U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Columbia by PEACHTREE GROUP, SSHCOF II WASHINGTON DC, LLC. (See Docket Entry1 to view document). (znmw) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel/Party
Wed 04/24 12:44 PM
NOTICE to Counsel/Party re1 Notice of Removal,(znmw) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
2 | 2
misc
Errata
Wed 04/24 11:32 AM
ERRATA by PEACHTREE GROUP, SSHCOF II WASHINGTON DC, LLC re1 Notice of Removal,.(Jakubowski, Teresa) |
|
Att: 1 Amended Notice of Removal | ||
notice
Notice of Error- New Case
Wed 04/24 10:51 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Notice of Removal,. The following error(s) need correction: Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file a Notice of Errata stating the error and attach the corrected initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party and file using the event Errata. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmw) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/24 12:42 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (znmw) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Order
Wed 04/24 2:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' motion to refer this case to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Columbia, Dkt. 4 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. This case is hereby REFERRED to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Columbia for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/24/2024. (lcrdm1) |
||
misc
Case Referred to Bankruptcy Court
Wed 04/24 2:52 PM
Case Referred to Bankruptcy Court re 04/24/2024 Minute Order on Motion for Order,. (zjm) |
||
misc
Receipt of Adversary Proceeding
Thu 04/25 11:42 AM
Receipt of Adversary Proceeding: 24-10015 ELG assigned by Bankruptcy Court. (zjm) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/23 7:52 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2024-CAB-002481 Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADCDC-10846871 filed by PEACHTREE GROUP d/b/a PEACHTREE HOTEL GROUP II, LLC, SSHCOF II WASHINGTON DC, LLC.(Jakubowski, Teresa) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |