Thomas v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark H Cohen |
Referred: | Linda T Walker |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01719 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 1:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Samantha K. Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
misc
Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP
Wed 05/01 5:04 PM
Clerk's Notation re2 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by Mark H. Cohen. (lme) |
||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/25 5:23 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Samantha K. Thomas. (Berry, Matthew) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/23 12:18 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13380457) filed by Samantha K. Thomas.(ajw) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |