VRC Services, LLC v. IRT Living, LLC et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Eleanor L Ross |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01720 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 1:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Does 1-3
|
|
Defendant
IRT Living, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
VRC Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/30 9:46 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by VRC Services, LLC. (Diwan, Christopher) |
|
misc
Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP
Tue 04/30 10:20 AM
Clerk's Notation re6 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by VRC Services, LLC. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) |
||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Mon 04/29 11:36 AM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by IRT Living, LLC. Discovery ends on 9/26/2024.(Miller, Jared) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
misc
Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP
Thu 04/25 10:39 AM
Clerk's Notation re4 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by IRT Living, LLC identifying Other Affiliate IRT Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Independence Realty Operating Partnership, LP, Other Affiliate Independence Realty Trust, Inc., Other Affiliate IRT Limited Partner, LLC for IRT Living, LLC. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/24 11:39 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by IRT Living, LLC identifying Other Affiliate IRT Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Independence Realty Operating Partnership, LP, Other Affiliate Independence Realty Trust, Inc., Other Affiliate IRT Limited Partner, LLC for IRT Living, LLC. (Miller, Jared) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
12
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/23 1:09 PM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Letter re:83.1
Tue 04/23 11:04 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to James R. Thompson. Clerk to follow-up by 5/3/2024. (cpp) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Tue 04/23 1:10 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorney James Thompson as to IRT Living, LLC re3 Order. (mlb) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/23 9:42 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by IRT Living, LLC. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13380734)(bmr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Georgia Secretary of State Records re VRC Services, LLC, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Copy of VRC Services Website, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - April 13, 2024 email from Defendants counsel to Plaintiffs counsel, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Georgia Secretary of State Records re IRT Living, LLC, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Application for Certificate of Authority for Limited Liability Company, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - First Page and Signature Page from Vendor Services Agreement between, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - All State Court Filings, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet |