Taylor v. Barriard
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy C Batten, Sr |
Referred: | Regina D Cannon |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01726 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Thu 04/25 1:27 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to William M. Taylor re3 Order. (dmb) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/25 1:23 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk to administratively close the present case and to file Plaintiff's complaint as an amended complaint in 1:23-cv-4230-TCB. The Clerk is further directed to terminate the referral to the undersigned in the present case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 4/24/2024. (dmb) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 04/25 1:26 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon terminated from case. (dmb) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/23 3:00 PM
Submission of2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account for IFP and frivolity determination to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (gww) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account
Tue 04/23 2:58 PM
Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by William M. Taylor. (gww) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/23 2:54 PM
COMPLAINT filed by William M. Taylor.(gww) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |