Robinson v. PNC Bank et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Victoria M Calvert |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01729 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 29, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 1:13 AM EDT |
Defendant
National Association (Inc.)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PNC Bank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
utility
Remark
Tue 04/30 12:54 PM
Case electronically remanded to Superior Court of DeKalb County re4 Order. Certified copy of remand order sent electronically. Filing status: Accepted. (jbu) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
5
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/30 10:12 AM
ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to REMAND this matter to the Superior Court of DeKalb County, Georgia. In the event Defendant obtains information in discovery that establishes by a preponderance of the evidence that the amount in controversy is more than $75,000, Defendant can remove the action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1446(b)(3). Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 4/29/2024. (jbu) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 04/30 10:16 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (jbu) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 04/24 10:02 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Victoria M. Calvert for all further proceedings. Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:24-cv-01729-VMC. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/24/2024. (jkb) |
|
utility
Submission to District Judge
Wed 04/24 10:03 AM
Submission of1 Notice of Removal, to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (jkb) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Leave of Absence
Tue 04/23 1:16 PM
Application for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 05/10/2024, by Charles W. Brown. (Brown, Charles) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/23 12:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT with Interlocutory Injunction filed by National Association (Inc.), PNC Bank. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13381497)(jkb) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Tue 04/23 12:56 PM
Submission of1 Notice of Removal, with Interlocutory Inj Hearing to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jkb) |