LC Optimist, LLC v. Barnes
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy C Batten, Sr |
Referred: | Linda T Walker |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01732 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 1:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
Kimberly Barnes
and All Other Occupants 2115 Piedmont Road NE Unit 1312
Atlanta, GA 30324 |
|
Plaintiff
LC Optimist, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order for Service of Report and Recommendation
Wed 05/01 4:35 PM
ORDER for Service of3 Order ruling on IFP and Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 5/1/2024. (dmb) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Report and Recommendation - Final Order ruling on IFP
Wed 05/01 4:34 PM
ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis and FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the2 Notice of Removal be remanded to the State Court of Fulton County. The Clerk is directed to terminate the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 5/1/2024. (dmb) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 05/01 4:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Kimberly Barnes.(dmb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Wed 05/01 4:36 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kimberly Barnes re3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 Notice of Removal, filed by Kimberly Barnes, and4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (dmb) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/23 3:33 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kimberly Barnes.(bmr) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/23 3:35 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (bmr) |