Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. United States Department of Education
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark H Cohen |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01744 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:0552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 1:15 AM EDT |
Defendant
United States Department of Education
|
|
Plaintiff
Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
misc
Approval of Application for Admission PHV
Thu 05/02 2:23 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:6 APPLICATION for Admission of Jordan Miller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13404977).. Attorney Jordan R. Miller added appearing on behalf of Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs) |
||
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/02 3:35 PM
MINUTE ORDER Granting6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jordan Miller by CRD at the direction of the Clerk's Office. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 5/2/24. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lme) |
||
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/01 2:00 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Jordan Miller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13404977).by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (Boucek, Braden) |
|
misc
Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP
Wed 05/01 5:05 PM
Clerk's Notation re3 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by Mark H. Cohen. (lme) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 04/23 4:04 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Department of Education. (nmb) |
|
4 | 4
30+
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/23 3:52 PM
STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/23/2024. (lme) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/23 3:17 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (Boucek, Braden) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Letter re:83.1
Tue 04/23 2:32 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Jordan R. Miller. Clerk to follow-up by 5/3/2024. (cpp) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/23 2:20 PM
COMPLAINT (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13382077) filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc..(gww) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 SLF FOIA request, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 DOE first acknowledgment, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 DOE second acknowledgment, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 DOE denial of fee waiver, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Email exchange from July, 2023, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Email exchange from January, 2024, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet |