Rice v. Jones et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William M Ray, II |
Referred: | Walter E Johnson |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00112 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order for Service of Report and Recommendation
Thu 05/02 3:25 PM
ORDER for Service of4 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 5/2/24. (klb) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Report and Recommendation - Final
Thu 05/02 3:24 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Complaint, filed by Jonathan Rice. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 5/2/24. (klb) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Thu 05/02 3:26 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jonathan Rice re5 Order for Service of Final Report and Recommendation and4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (klb) |
||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order ruling on IFP ~Util - Directing Warden to Collect Monthly Payments from Inmate
Mon 04/29 10:40 AM
ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis, allowing Plaintiff to proceed IFP, however, Plaintiff is obligated to pay $350.00 as funds are deposited into Inmate account. The Warden or the designee shall collect the monthly payments and remit to Clerk until $350.00 is paid in full. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 4/29/24. c:Financial Office(klb) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Mon 04/29 10:41 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jonathan Rice re3 Order. (klb) |
||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Mon 04/29 10:42 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Warden Hays State Prison re3 Order. (klb) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/23 11:24 AM
Submission of1 Complaint,2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (dob) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account
Tue 04/23 11:21 AM
Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Jonathan Rice.(dob) |
|
Att: 1 Letter | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/23 11:20 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Jonathan Rice.(dob) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |