Member Case
Lead case is: 3:24-bk-10311

Louisiana Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael A Crawford
Case #: 3:24-bk-10312
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2024
Terminated:Dec 19, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Kologik Capital, LLC
301 Main St Ste 2200
Baton Rouge, LA 70801-0014
Represented By
Louis M. Phillips
One American Place
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
400 Poydras Street Suite 2110
New Orleans, LA 70130
Represented By
Christy Renee Bergeron
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 12:01 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
39 39 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 04/16 12:44 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number Kologik Capital, LLC for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by Amelia L. Hurt of Kelly Hart & Hallman on behalf of Kologik Capital, LLC. (Hurt, Amelia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
38 38 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Thu 01/30 8:13 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number Kologik Capital, LLC for the Month Ending: 12/19/2024 Filed by Amelia L. Hurt of Kelly Hart & Hallman on behalf of Kologik Capital, LLC. (Hurt, Amelia)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
37 37 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 12/23 11:16 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-10312 for the Month Ending: 11/30/2024 Filed by Amelia L. Hurt of Kelly Hart & Hallman on behalf of Kologik Capital, LLC. (Hurt, Amelia)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 21, 2024
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sat 12/21 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order RE: related document(s)35 Order (Generic). Notice Date 12/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
35 35 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 12/19 2:31 PM
Order Granting Ex Parte Motion Administratively Closing Cases Pending Further Order of the Court. (See Motion [P-361] filed in 24-10311 Filed on 12/19/2024. (scha)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 12/19 2:31 PM
Bankruptcy Case Administratively Closed. (scha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Thu 11/21 11:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order RE: related document(s)31 Order (Generic). Notice Date 11/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Thu 11/21 11:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order RE: related document(s)30 Objection to Claim. Notice Date 11/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Thu 11/21 10:04 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number Kologik Capital, LLC for the Month Ending: 10/31/2024 Filed by Amelia L. Hurt of Kelly Hart & Hallman on behalf of Kologik Capital, LLC. (Hurt, Amelia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 11/19 11:59 AM
Order Disallowing the Claim of J. Bart Kelly on Schedule D, 2.2 Filed on 11/19/2024. (scha)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Objection to Claim Tue 11/19 11:49 AM
Order Sustaining in part, Overruling in part Objection to Claim 2 Filed on 11/19/2024. Claim No. 2 is Allowed as a general unsecured claim in the amount of $43,912.74. (scha)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
29 29 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 10/21 11:28 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number Kologik Capital, LLC for the Month Ending: 09/30/2024 Filed by Amelia L. Hurt of Kelly Hart & Hallman on behalf of Kologik Capital, LLC. (Hurt, Amelia)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
28 28 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 09/23 11:30 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number Kologik Capital, LLC for the Month Ending: 08/31/2024 Filed by Amelia L. Hurt of Kelly Hart & Hallman on behalf of Kologik Capital, LLC. (Hurt, Amelia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
27 27 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 08/21 10:21 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-10312 for the Month Ending: 07/31/2024 Filed by Amelia L. Hurt of Kelly Hart & Hallman on behalf of Kologik Capital, LLC. (Hurt, Amelia)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
26 26 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 07/22 10:14 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-10312 for the Month Ending: 06/30/2024 Filed by Louis M. Phillips on behalf of Kologik Capital, LLC. (Phillips, Louis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deficiency Wed 06/26 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deficiency RE: related document(s)23 Notice of Deficiency for Incomplete PDF Attached - form. Notice Date 06/26/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
24 24 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 06/24 12:04 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number Kologik Capital, LLC for the Month Ending: 05/31/2024 Filed by Amelia L. Hurt of Kelly Hart & Hallman on behalf of Kologik Capital, LLC. (Hurt, Amelia)
Related: [-]
23 23 court Notice of Deficiency for Incomplete PDF Attached - form Mon 06/24 11:16 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: When filing the document, an incomplete PDF was attached. Please refile to include all pages. Failure to correct this error within 7 days will result in the court striking the document without further notice from the court. RE: related document(s)22 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR filed by Debtor Kologik Capital, LLC. Document(s) due by 7/1/2024. (scha)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 06/24 9:20 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number Kologik Capital, LLC for the Month Ending: 05/31/2024 Filed by Amelia L. Hurt of Kelly Hart & Hallman on behalf of Kologik Capital, LLC. (Hurt, Amelia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Tue 06/18 11:13 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Rudy J. Cerone of McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC on behalf of Rob Wolf RE: related document(s)20 Notice of Appearance filed by Creditor Rob Wolf. (Cerone, Rudy)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 06/18 11:11 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Rudy J. Cerone Filed by Rudy J. Cerone of McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC on behalf of Rob Wolf (Cerone, Rudy)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Tue 06/18 10:06 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Timothy G. Byrd Jr of McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC on behalf of Rob Wolf RE: related document(s)18 Notice of Appearance filed by Creditor Rob Wolf. (Byrd, Timothy)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 06/18 10:04 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Timothy G. Byrd Jr Filed by Timothy G. Byrd Jr of McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC on behalf of Rob Wolf (Byrd, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
17 17 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Tue 05/21 3:40 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 04/30/2024 Filed by Amelia L. Hurt of Kelly Hart & Hallman on behalf of Kologik Capital, LLC. (Hurt, Amelia)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
16 16 trustee Chapter 11 Proceeding Memo-Meeting of Creditors Held Fri 05/17 2:33 PM
Proceeding Memo, Chapter 11-Meeting of Creditors Held Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee RE: related document(s)12 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Business) filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee. (Bergeron, Christy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
15 15 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Tue 05/14 10:25 AM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Louis M. Phillips on behalf of Kologik Capital, LLC. (Phillips, Louis)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
14 14 misc Schedule A/B Mon 05/13 6:05 PM
Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information, Schedule A/B: Property, Schedule D , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G , Schedule H , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Louis M. Phillips on behalf of Kologik Capital, LLC. (Phillips, Louis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
utility Update Other Deadlines Tue 05/07 4:19 PM
Deadlines Updated. Incomplete Filings due by 5/13/2024. (scha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Wed 05/01 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. RE: related document(s)12 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Business) filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee. Notice Date 05/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
court Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2) Tue 04/30 2:42 PM
Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2) Filed by Amelia L. Hurt of Kelly Hart & Hallman on behalf of Kologik Capital, LLC RE: related document(s)1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Kologik Capital, LLC. (Hurt, Amelia)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 27, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sat 04/27 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order RE: related document(s)9 Order on Motion For Joint Administration. Notice Date 04/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Business) Fri 04/26 1:33 PM
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Business) Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/17/2024 at 11:00 AM via Telephone Conference. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/16/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 07/2/2024. (Brown, Tammy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Thu 04/25 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order RE: related document(s)6 Order (Generic). Notice Date 04/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
9 9 3 pgs order Joint Administration Thu 04/25 2:34 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case 3:24-bk-10311 with Member Case 3:24-bk-10312 Related [+] Filed on 4/25/2024. (scha)
Related: [-] 3
court Notice - Text Only Thu 04/25 3:04 PM
An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Kologik, LLC; Kologik Capital, LLC; and Kologik Capital II, LLC. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Kologik, LLC should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. RE: related document(s)9 Order on Motion For Joint Administration. (scha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Wed 04/24 1:52 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Louis M. Phillips on behalf of Kologik Capital, LLC RE: related document(s)3 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Kologik Capital, LLC. (Phillips, Louis)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 04/24 8:26 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Ryan James Richmond Filed by Ryan James Richmond of Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC on behalf of TSB Ventures, LLC (Richmond, Ryan)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 04/24 1:08 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-10312 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A4326161, in the Amount of $1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
6 6 6 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 04/23 5:28 PM
Order Setting Emergency Hearing on First Day Motions filed in 24-10311 Re: Filed on 4/23/2024. Hearing Scheduled for 4/25/2024 at 11:00 a.m., 707 Florida St., Rm. 222. (scha)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/23 5:20 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Christy Renee Bergeron of DOJ-Ust on behalf of U.S. Trustee RE: related document(s)4 Notice of Appearance filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee. (Bergeron, Christy)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 04/23 5:07 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Christy Renee Bergeron Filed by Christy Renee Bergeron of DOJ-Ust on behalf of U.S. Trustee (Bergeron, Christy)
Related: [-]
3 3 7 pgs motion Joint Administration Tue 04/23 3:29 PM
Emergency Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Louis M. Phillips on behalf of Kologik Capital, LLC. (Phillips, Louis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Proposed Order
2 2 2 pgs misc Verification of Creditor Matrix Tue 04/23 3:21 PM
Verification of Creditor Matrix Filed by Louis M. Phillips on behalf of Kologik Capital, LLC. (Phillips, Louis)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 04/23 3:09 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Kologik Capital, LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 8/21/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 8/21/2024. (Phillips, Louis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Executed Consents
Att: 2 1 pgs Equity Holders
Att: 3 2 pgs Corporate Ownership