Stark Energy, Inc.
North Dakota Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shon Hastings |
Case #: | 3:24-bk-30168 |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 30, 2024 |
Claims Deadline: | Jul 02, 2024 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | Jul 29, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Stark Energy, Inc.
PO Box 748
1860 4th Ave E Dickinson, ND 58602-0748 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Thomas Kapusta
PO Box 90624
Sioux Falls, SD 57109 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Robert B. Raschke
Assistant U.S. Trustee Suite 1015 U.S. Courthouse 300 South Fourth Street
Minneapolis, MN 55415 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 12:02 PM CDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 05/01 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/01/2024. (Admin.) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Relief from Stay
Wed 05/01 4:31 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay Including: Notice of Motion served on 5/1/2024 and Certificate of Service Fee Amount $199, Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank Last day to object is 05/15/2024. (Stanley, Caren) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Wed 05/01 4:33 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK 24-30168 ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1542605. Fee amount 199.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Small Business Balance Sheet
Tue 04/30 7:57 AM
Small Business Balance Sheet Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. ( related document(s) 3 Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines). (AHLGREN, ERIK) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Small Business Cash Flow Statement
Tue 04/30 6:03 AM
Statement of Operations for Small Business, Small Business Cash Flow Statement Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. ( related document(s) 3 Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines). (AHLGREN, ERIK) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Small Business Federal Income Tax Return
Tue 04/30 6:00 AM
Small Business Federal Income Tax Documents for the Year for 2020 Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. ( related document(s) 3 Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines). (AHLGREN, ERIK) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
court
Document
Mon 04/29 10:59 AM
Copy of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition emailed to Securities and Exchange Commission at denver@sec.gov (vck, Court) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order to Set Hearing (Status Conf. SubV)
Mon 04/29 10:45 AM
Order Setting Telephonic Status Conference in a Case Filed Under Subchapter V Signed on 4/29/2024. Telephonic Hearing to be held on 6/13/2024 at 01:30 PM . Pre-Status Conference Report Due By 5/30/2024 . Attorney Erik Ahlgren to serve order on interested parties. (sfh, Court) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Creditors Request for Notice
Fri 04/26 5:13 AM
Creditors Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Ally Bank, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC. (Sharma, Amitkumar) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Thu 04/25 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 24. Notice Date 04/25/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 04/23 4:36 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Caren W. Stanley Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank. (Stanley, Caren) |
|
7 | 7
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Tue 04/23 3:10 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/30/2024 at 02:00 PM via Telephone conference ONLY. Toll free: 866-821-5980, Participant # 9065076. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/29/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 7/2/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/21/2024. (vck, Court) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 04/23 2:37 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Caren W. Stanley Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank. (Stanley, Caren) |
|
5 | 5
trustee
Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee
Tue 04/23 2:07 PM
Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee . Thomas Kapusta added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke. (Raschke, Robert) |
|
4 | 4
6
pgs
motion
Employ
Tue 04/23 12:36 PM
Application to Employ Erik A. Ahlgren and Ahlgren Law Office, PLLC as Debtor's Attorney Including: Notice of Motion served on 4/23/2024 and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. Last day to object is 05/14/2024. (AHLGREN, ERIK) (updated objection period to 21 days) Modified on 4/23/2024 (vck, Court) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines
Tue 04/23 10:03 AM
Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines SB Statement of Operations Due: 4/30/2024. SB Balance Sheet: 4/30/2024. Tax Return Deadline: 4/30/2024. SB Cash Flow Statement: 4/30/2024. (vck, Court) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 04/23 8:51 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Including: Certificate of Service by Sarah J. Wencil Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke. (Wencil, Sarah) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 04/23 7:41 AM
Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition Non-Individual, List of Creditors Who Have The 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders, Corporate Ownership Statement . Fee Amount $1738 Filed by ERIK A. AHLGREN on behalf of Stark Energy, Inc. Atty Disclosure Statement due 05/7/2024. Declaration About Debtors Schedules due 05/7/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 05/7/2024. Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122B Due: 05/7/2024. Schedule A/B due 05/7/2024. Schedule C due 05/7/2024. Schedule D due 05/7/2024. Schedule E/F due 05/7/2024. Schedule G due 05/7/2024. Schedule H due 05/7/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/7/2024. Summary of assets and liabilities due 05/7/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 05/7/2024. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 07/22/2024. (AHLGREN, ERIK) (enhanced docket; removed incorrect deadlines) Modified on 4/23/2024 (vck, Court) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 04/23 10:13 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-30168 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1540665. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |