Woodland v. Meisner
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brett H Ludwig |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00482 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Acceptance of Service by DOJ
Thu 04/25 12:44 PM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to Michael Meisner (Vandermeuse, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Wed 04/24 4:24 PM
ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 4/24/24 granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Within 60 days of the date of this Order, Respondent shall either answer the petition, complying with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing § 2254 Cases, or file a dispositive motion. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(jad) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate
Tue 04/23 1:27 PM
LETTER from the clerk to Petitioner requesting that the consent/refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin be filed within 21 days. (kah) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Tue 04/23 1:18 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Corey Woodland. (kah) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Tue 04/23 1:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Corey Woodland. (kah) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 04/23 1:08 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Corey Woodland.(kah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits to Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |