Ricks (PS) v. Babcock et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Scott T Varholak |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01109 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Minute Order
Wed 05/01 9:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 05/01/2024. In light of Plaintiff's April 26, 2024 notice of change of address filed in this action (ECF No.6 ), the Clerk of Court is directed to mail one copy of the April 25, 2024 Order Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies (ECF No.5 ) to Plaintiff at his new address of record. (Copy of Order mailed as ordered.) Further, Plaintiff sua sponte is granted an extension to thirty days from the date of this minute order to comply with the April 25, 2024 order to cure (ECF No.5 ). This action may be dismissed without further notice if Plaintiff fails to comply with the April 25 order within the time allowed. (pklin, ) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information
Mon 04/29 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information, by Plaintiff John Allen Ricks (ccuen, ) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/25 9:16 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 04/25/2024. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order . If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. (pklin, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case Order of Recusal
Wed 04/24 9:44 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 04/24/2024. IT IS ORDERED that: (1) I recuse myself from further service in this matter; and (2) The Clerk of the Court shall cause this case to be reassigned. This case is directly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-01109-STV . (pklin, ) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Tue 04/23 11:22 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/23 11:20 AM
Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff John Allen Ricks. (efoga, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/23 11:17 AM
PRISONER COMPLAINT against Lewis T. Babcock, Susan B. Prose, filed by John Allen Ricks.(efoga, ) |