Omar et al (PS) v. Diggins et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Prose |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01118 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel
Thu 05/02 10:11 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 5/2/2024. Plaintiff Ellu M. Omar's motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No.2 ) is denied without prejudice as premature because this case is under initial review. Plaintiff may renew his request for counsel by filing, on the court- approved form, a Prisoner Motion for Appointment of Counsel if the case is later drawn to a presiding judge under Local Rule 8.1(c).(ccuen, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
4
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/24 8:55 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. ORDERED that Plaintiffs cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order . Any papers filed in response to this order must be labeled with the civil action number identified on this order. If Plaintiffs fail to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order , the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 4/23/2024. (ccuen, ) Modified to edit docket text on 4/24/2024 (ccuen, ) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Tue 04/23 2:19 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (blaws) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Appoint Pro Bono Counsel
Tue 04/23 2:17 PM
MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Ellu M. Omar. (blaws) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/23 2:16 PM
COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights (Prisoner Complaint) against Bruning, Diggins, Koch, Line, Rutan, Sims, filed by Ellu M. Omar. (blaws) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |