Tolliver (PS) v. Millian et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Prose |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01124 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 2:06 AM MDT |
Defendant
Jhon Jackson
|
|
Defendant
Kylie Jenner
|
|
Defendant
Kim Kardashian
|
|
Defendant
Kohle Kardashian
|
|
Defendant
Kardashians
|
|
Defendant
Christina Millian
|
|
Plaintiff
Kamilah Tolliver
3601 South Dallas Street
Denver, CO 80231 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 05/01 3:15 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. re:1 Employment Discrimination Complaint, 2 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge,3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Addressed to Kamilah Tolliver. (dgumb, ) |
|
4 | 4
6
pgs
order
Order
Wed 05/01 10:33 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES AND AMEND COMPLAINT. It is ORDERED that within thirty days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file an Amended Employment Discrimination Complaint that complies with the directives in this order and that cures the designated deficiencies. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this order within the time allowed, this action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 5/1/2024. (dgumb, ) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/23 3:41 PM
Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Plaintiff Kamilah Tolliver. (agarc, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Tue 04/23 3:40 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (agarc, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/23 3:38 PM
Employment Discrimination Complaint against Jhon Jackson, Kylie Jenner, Kim Kardashian, Kohle Kardashian, Kardashians, and Christina Millian, filed by Kamilah Tolliver.(agarc, ) |