Lindsey v. Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Kathryn A Starnella |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01133 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 2:07 AM MDT |
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Lindsey
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Statement
Fri 05/03 4:29 PM
STATEMENT Disclosure by Defendant Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company. (Ross-Shannon, Bradley) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/30 4:33 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint by Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company.(Ross-Shannon, Bradley) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/26 2:18 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company(Ross-Shannon, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Civil Case Cover Sheet - State Court Action, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons - State Court Action, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Complaint - State Court Action, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Delay Reduction Order - State Court Action, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Affidavit of Service - State Court Action, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Proposed Order re: Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk - State Court Action, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Motion for Entry of Entry of Default by Clerk - State Court Action, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Federal Court Notice of Removal - State Court Action, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Notice of Removal - State Court Action | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate (Miscellaneous)
Fri 04/26 2:08 PM
CERTIFICATE of Disclosure Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Plaintiff Patricia Lindsey. (VanMatre, Shannon) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/26 1:23 PM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 26 April 2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than May 3, 2024, the parties shall file their Rule 7.1(a) disclosure statements. (cmadr, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Wed 04/24 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shannon Kay VanMatre on behalf of Patricia LindseyAttorney Shannon Kay VanMatre added to party Patricia Lindsey(pty:pla) (VanMatre, Shannon) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Wed 04/24 9:57 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Wed 04/24 9:56 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry. (blaws) |
|
4 | 4
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint
Wed 04/24 9:55 AM
NOTICE of Service of Process of Summons, Complaint upon Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company on 03/26/2024. (blaws) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/24 9:53 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company, filed by Patricia Lindsey. (blaws) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases
Wed 04/24 9:52 AM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (blaws) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/23 5:36 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2024cv30623. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9652450), filed by Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company.(Ross-Shannon, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Civil Case Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Notice of Service of Process |