Arizona District Court
Judge:Susan M Brnovich
Case #: 2:24-cv-00918
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 19, 2024 4:17 AM MST
Defendant
Parsons Xtreme Golf
Represented By
Daniel Benjamin Pasternak
Squire Patton Boggs (us) LLP
contact info
Efthalia S Rofos
O'Hagan Meyer - Newport Beach
contact info
Daniel David Spencer
O'Hagan Meyer - Los Angeles
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Plaintiff
John Vaupel
Represented By
Daniel Lee Bonnett
Martin & Bonnett PLLC
contact info
Mirra Carrier
Martin & Bonnett PLLC
contact info
Jordan Allen Walker
Martin & Bonnett PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM MST
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
30 30 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 05/14 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Parsons Xtreme Golf. (Spencer, Daniel)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Deposition Wed 05/14 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Samantha "Sammi" Satori filed by John Vaupel. (Bonnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Deposition Wed 05/14 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Tawnee Reiner filed by John Vaupel. (Bonnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Deposition Wed 05/14 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant Parsons Xtreme Golf filed by John Vaupel. (Bonnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 05/13 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by John Vaupel. (Bonnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 05/09 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by John Vaupel. (Bonnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/21 5:06 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation and Motion to Amend Rule 16 Case Management Order to Modify Remaining Deadlines (Doc.23 ). The deadline for completion of fact discovery is extended to July 14, 2025. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is extended to September 15, 2025. The deadline to engage in good faith settlement talks is extended to July 28, 2025. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the July 11, 2025 Telephonic Trial Setting Conference is reset to September 29, 2025 at 9:00 a.m. (15 minutes allowed). Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/21/2025. (KJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
23 23 misc Stipulation Thu 04/17 2:13 PM
STIPULATION / Joint Stipulation and Motion to Amend Rule 16 Case Management Order to Modify Remaining Deadlines (Doc. 12) (First Request) re:12 Scheduling Order,,, Terminate Hearings,, by John Vaupel.(Bonnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
22 22 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 03/04 8:56 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting the parties' Joint21 Motion for Entry of Protective Order. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 3/3/2025. (ESG)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
21 21 motion Protective Order Mon 03/03 9:35 AM
MOTION for Protective Order / Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order by John Vaupel.(Bonnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order - Proposed Protective Order with Exhibit A
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 02/19 5:09 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by John Vaupel. (Bonnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 02/19 5:08 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by John Vaupel. (Bonnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 01/17 5:44 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Parsons Xtreme Golf. (Spencer, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 11/27 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Parsons Xtreme Golf. (Spencer, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 10/09 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by John Vaupel. (Bonnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 07/12 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by John Vaupel. (Bonnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only) Fri 07/12 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal Jordan A. Walker filed by Daniel Lee Bonnett. (Bonnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 07/11 5:05 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Parsons Xtreme Golf. (Spencer, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings Wed 07/03 8:24 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/25/2025. Dispositive motions due by 6/27/2025. IT IS ORDERED the 7/8/2024 Rule 16 Case Management Conference is vacated. On 7/11/2025 at 8:45 a.m. (15 minutes allowed), the Court will conduct a telephonic trial setting conference. Participants shall have their calendars available for the conference. The parties will receive dial-in instructions for connecting to the teleconference via electronic mail prior to the hearing. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 7/2/2024. (ESG)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
11 11 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Mon 07/01 4:23 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by John Vaupel. (Bonnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Fri 06/07 4:14 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Daniel David Spencer on behalf of Defendant Parsons Xtreme Golf. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 06/06 8:43 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Efthalia S Rofos on behalf of Defendant Parsons Xtreme Golf. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
10 10 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 05/24 2:51 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 7/8/2024 at 9:15 a.m. (15 minutes allowed). The parties will receive dial-in instructions for connecting to the teleconference via electronic mail prior to the hearing. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 10 days before the Case Management Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). The parties shall jointly file the Case Management Report with the Clerk not less than seven days before the Case Management Conference. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 5/24/2024. (ESG)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/24 12:17 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parsons Xtreme Golf. (Pasternak, Daniel)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/24 12:16 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Parsons Xtreme Golf.(Pasternak, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
7 7 service Service Executed Mon 05/06 10:25 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by John Vaupel: Return of Service re: Summons (Doc. 4), Complaint (Doc. 1), Notice of Availability of U.S. Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction (Doc. 3), Preliminary Order (Doc. 5), and Order (Doc. 6) upon Scott Prulhiere, In-House Counsel,c/o Defendant Parsons Xtreme Golf, LLC on 05/03/2024. (Bonnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 04/23 3:24 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on July 22, 2024. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 4/23/2024. (ESG)
Related: [-]
5 5 4 pgs order Order Tue 04/23 3:22 PM
PRELIMINARY ORDER this matter having recently come before this Court, the parties are advised of the following preliminary policies and procedures that will govern these proceedings and are ordered as follows. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. See attached Order for complete details . Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 4/23/2024. (ESG)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 04/23 12:04 PM
Summons Issued as to Parsons Xtreme Golf. (REK)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
3 3 misc New Case Opened Tue 04/23 12:02 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22972693. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-00918 PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Tue 04/23 12:01 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by John Vaupel. (submitted by Daniel Bonnett) (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/23 12:00 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22972693 filed by John Vaupel. (submitted by Daniel Bonnett)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet