David Magnuson v. Trulite Glass & Aluminum Solutions, LLC
Original Case: 1:19-cv-06158
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01660 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 4:13 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
TRULITE GLASS & ALUMINUM SOLUTIONS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAVID W. MAGNUSON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 3:17 AM CDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant David W. Magnuson by 04/26/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 05/06/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/03/2024 for David W. Magnuson [1] [7378041] 24-1660 (AP) [Entered: 04/23/2024 11:01 AM] | |
Att: 1 78 pgs Civil Case | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court |