Emigrant Residential LLC v. Pinti
Original Case: 1:19-cv-12258
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-civil-01404 |
Type | civil / private / real property |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 4:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
LESLEY R. PHILLIPS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
LINDA S. PINTI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
EMIGRANT RESIDENTIAL LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 4:16 AM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #125) filed by Appellant Linda S. Pinti. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 05/07/2024. 24-1404 (AVN) | ||
Att: 1 55 pgs Abbreviated Record | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF |