Original Case: 2:15-cr-20246

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cr-01343
Typecriminal / post-conviction
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2024
Terminated:Jul 19, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 16, 2024 7:03 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellant
THEODORE VIRGIL CHANDLER
Represented By
Alvin L. Keel
Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Rajesh Krishna Prasad
Office of the U.S. Attorney
contact info
Steven P. Cares
Office of the U.S. Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2024 7:03 AM CDT
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
The case manager for this case is: Virginia Padgett (VLP)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Criminal Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Theodore Virgil Chandler. Transcript needed: n. (VLP)
Related: [-]
6 pgs BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 06/03/2024;. appellee brief due 07/03/2024; (VLP)
Related: [-]