Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Bruce E Reinhart
Referred: Bruce E Reinhart
Case #: 9:24-cv-80506
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 21, 2024 4:20 AM EDT
Defendant
DP Development, LLC
Represented By
Yadhira Ramirez-Toro
Litigation
contact info
Mediator
Esq. Blane McCarthy
4651 Salisbury Road, Suite 170
Jacksonville, FL 32256
Plaintiff
Crown Castle Fiber, LLC
Represented By
Kristie P Mace
Goede, Adamczyk, Deboest , Cross, PLLC
contact info
Anthony J. Jorgenson
Jorgenson PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
41 41 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 04/11 4:10 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot40 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's discovery demands. The Court's Scheduling Order states that parties should only file a motion when they "are unable to agree on a modification of a pretrial deadline." ECF No. 35 at 3. Discovery deadlines "may be modified without Court order by filing a joint notice indicating the new pretrial deadline(s) reached by agreement." Id. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/11/2025. (hk02)
Related: [-]
40 40 motion Extension of Time Fri 04/11 3:16 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to obtain an extension of time up to and including May 7, 2025, to respond to Plaintiff's discovery by DP Development, LLC. Responses due by 4/25/2025.(Carman, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
39 39 service Summons Issued Wed 04/09 11:41 AM
Summons Issued as to Community Asphalt Corp., Universal Site Contractors, LLC. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
38 38 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 04/07 7:45 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by DP Development, LLC. (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
37 37 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Mon 03/24 12:10 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT COMES NOW against All Defendants, filed by Crown Castle Fiber, LLC.(Mace, Kristie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Summon(s)
36 36 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Mon 03/24 11:39 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT COMES NOW against All Defendants, filed by Crown Castle Fiber, LLC.(Mace, Kristie)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/17 10:51 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per DE 35 Dispositive Motions due by 1/30/2026. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
35 35 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/14 3:17 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/22/2026 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2025. Expert Discovery due by 10/24/2025. Fact Discovery due by 10/17/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2025. Motions due by 1/30/2026. Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/13/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/14/2025. See attached document for full details. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/13 3:10 PM
NOTICE of filing amended joint proposed scheduling order by DP Development, LLC re 33 Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing,, (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
utility ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 03/11 10:55 AM
Status Conference,Calendar Call and Jury Trial set before prior presiding Judge (Rosenberg) has been terminated. (ldm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
33 33 order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing Fri 03/07 4:26 PM
PAPERLESS Order Setting a Telephonic Status Conference for 3/14/2025 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart to discuss new pretrial deadlines and a trial date. Counsel shall confer and jointly submit a proposed new scheduling order by 3/13/25. Counsel shall appear telephonically using the following conference call instructions: Dial: 833-435-1820 (or 833-568-8864); Enter Meeting ID: 160 225 1740# and Passcode: 576690#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/7/2025. (hk02)
Related: [-]
32 32 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 03/07 10:42 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for all further proceedings, including trial and all post-judgment proceedings. Judge Robin L. Rosenberg no longer assigned as presider judge in case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/6/2025. See attached document for full details. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
31 31 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 02/24 1:01 PM
Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge signed by all parties . Filed by DP Development, LLC (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
30 30 minutes Status Conference Fri 02/14 3:48 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Zoom Telephone Discovery Status Conference held on 2/14/2025. Total time in court: 10 minutes. (hk02)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
29 29 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 02/10 10:04 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER directing counsel to appear telephonically at the Discovery Status Conference on 2/14/25. Counsel shall appear using the following conference call instructions: Dial: 833-435-1820 (or 833-568-8864); Enter Meeting ID: 160 225 1740# and Passcode: 576690#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 2/10/2025. (hk02)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
28 28 misc Status Report Fri 02/07 12:33 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery in compliance with ECF 22 by Crown Castle Fiber, LLC, DP Development, LLC (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/14 6:08 PM
Joint NOTICE of parties' agreement to modify pretrial deadline pertaining to expert witness' disclosures by DP Development, LLC re21 Scheduling Order,,,, Order of Requirements,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Wed 12/04 12:19 PM
Joint NOTICE for Continuance of Mediation Scheduled for December 10, 2024 by DP Development, LLC re25 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing. Attorney Kenneth Philip Carman added to party DP Development, LLC (pty:dft). (Carman, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
25 25 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Fri 08/02 5:32 PM
Defendant's NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Blane McCarthy as Mediator. (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
24 24 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/30 4:15 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by DP Development, LLC. (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
23 23 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 07/29 2:20 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. The Defendant, in its Motion to Dismiss11 , does not seek to dismiss any count in the Plaintiff's Complaint. Instead, the Defendant seeks to strike the Plaintiff's request for punitive damages. As a result, Rule 12(f) governs. E.g., Huchings v. Fed. Ins. Co., No. 08-CV-305, 2008 WL 4186994, at *2 (M.D. Fla. Sept. 8, 2008). Rule 12(f) permits a court to strike from a pleading anything that is "redundant, immaterial, impertinent, or scandalous." Upon review of the Complaint, the Court concludes that the Plaintiff's request for punitive damages is not redundant, immaterial, or scandalous. Indeed, a motion to strike should only be granted when "the matter sought to be omitted has no possible relationship to the controversy." Id. Given this high standard, motions to strike are generally disfavored and courts have noted that they are "often considered time wasters." Id. Defendant's request to strike the punitive damages demand is denied, and the Defendant shall file an answer within ten days of the date of rendition of this Order. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
22 22 2 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 07/03 1:10 PM
ORDER SETTING ZOOM DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE: Joint Discovery Status Report due by 2/7/2025. Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 2/14/2025 3:30 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/3/2024. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
21 21 order Scheduling Order Order of Requirements Order Referring Case to Mediation Tue 07/02 3:22 PM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MEDIATION: Fact Discovery due by 3/14/2025. Expert Discovery due by 3/14/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 4/14/2025. Jury Trial set for 7/14/2025 9:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. Calendar Call set for 7/9/2025 10:30 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. Status Conference set for 5/28/2025 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. Mediation Deadline 5/13/2025. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/2/2024. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 07/01 2:21 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
19 19 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Thu 06/27 1:48 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by DP Development, LLC (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 06/26 8:14 PM
Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re11 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to dismiss Plaintiff's request for punitive damages filed by DP Development, LLC. (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
17 17 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Mon 06/24 2:44 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re16 Stipulation,. Proposed Order Docketed as Main Document ; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED WITHIN 3 DAYS - Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then resubmit the proposed order as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (pcs)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Stipulation Mon 06/24 1:16 PM
STIPULATION re15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time file joint scheduling report and proposed pretrial deadlines re9 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion by Crown Castle Fiber, LLC (Mace, Kristie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time Thu 06/20 8:02 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time file joint scheduling report and proposed pretrial deadlines re9 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, by DP Development, LLC. Responses due by 7/8/2024. (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/20 9:09 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Anthony Jorgenson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/20/2024. (hk02)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
13 13 respm Response to Motion Wed 06/19 1:23 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re11 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Crown Castle Fiber, LLC. Replies due by 6/26/2024. (Mace, Kristie)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Wed 06/19 1:19 PM
Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Anthony Jorgenson. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-17472984. Filing Fee $ 200.00 by Crown Castle Fiber, LLC. Responses due by 7/3/2024. (Mace, Kristie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 06/04 4:35 PM
Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by DP Development, LLC. Attorney Yadhira Ramirez-Toro added to party DP Development, LLC (pty:dft). Responses due by 6/18/2024. (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
10 10 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 05/22 11:35 AM
STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
9 9 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 05/22 10:55 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ON SERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS, referring case to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
8 8 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Tue 05/21 10:27 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re6 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 7 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (pcs)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 05/21 10:26 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Crown Castle Fiber, LLC. DP Development, LLC served on 5/16/2024, response/answer due 6/6/2024 (See DE6 for image). (pcs)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Certificate of Service Tue 05/21 9:58 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Crown Castle Fiber, LLC (Mace, Kristie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/24 12:02 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by Crown Castle Fiber, LLC (Mace, Kristie)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 04/24 11:32 AM
Summons Issued as to DP Development, LLC. (kpe)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Wed 04/24 11:21 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (kpe)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 04/24 11:17 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/24 11:03 AM
COMPLAINT Crown Castle Fiber LLC against DP Development, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-AFLSDC-17472984, payment transferred from : 9:24-cv-80506, filed by Crown Castle Fiber, LLC.(Mace, Kristie) Modified text on 4/24/2024 (kpe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Complaint,
Att: 2 Summon(s)