Evgenii Savchuk v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fred W Slaughter |
Referred: | Stephanie S Christensen |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00886 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 8:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
|
Defendant
David Radel
|
|
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
|
|
Defendant
U.S. Department of Homeland Security
|
|
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
|
|
Plaintiff
Evgenii Savchuk
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 04/29 9:51 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Alejandro Mayorkas, David Radel, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Ur M. Jaddou. (jp) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 04/26 3:34 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Summons Request
Fri 04/26 2:56 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Evgenii Savchuk. (Dachelet, Laure) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 04/26 2:55 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Evgenii Savchuk, (Dachelet, Laure) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
cs_rasgn
Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89)
Thu 04/25 3:44 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:24-cv-00886-FWS-(SSCx). (dve) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Thu 04/25 2:51 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 04/25 2:49 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 04/25 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (car) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 04/24 5:30 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Evgenii Savchuk. (Dachelet, Laure) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 04/24 5:28 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37343280 - Fee: $405, filed by plaintiff Evgenii Savchuk. (Attorney Laure A Dachelet added to party Evgenii Savchuk(pty:pla))(Dachelet, Laure) |