LEVY v. ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Roy K Altman |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21547 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 11:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD
|
|
Plaintiff
GILBERT LEVY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Fri 05/03 8:19 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by GILBERT LEVY. ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD served on 5/1/2024, response/answer due 5/22/2024. (Irazabal, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/24 10:39 AM
Summons Issued as to ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD. (wce) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 04/24 10:36 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/24 10:13 AM
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES LTD.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17473309, filed by GILBERT LEVY.(Irazabal, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |